This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/13/2022 at 12:33:15 (UTC).

MICHAEL ODJAGHIAN VS ESMIRALDA GOMEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 MICHAEL ODJAGHIAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ESMIRALDA GOMEZ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3398

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ODJAGHIAN MICHAEL

Defendants

GOMEZ ESMIRALDA

GOMEZ MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROCK CAMERON Y.

Defendant Attorney

MUENCH RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/22/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

4/22/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/22/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/22/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/22/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/22/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

4/22/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

4/22/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Answer

5/25/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/25/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

5/25/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Personal Service

5/16/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/16/2022: Proof of Personal Service

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2025
  • Hearing04/18/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2023
  • Hearing10/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2023
  • Hearing10/06/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Esmiralda Gomez (Defendant); Maria Gomez (Defendant); As to: Michael Odjaghian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Esmiralda Gomez (Defendant); Maria Gomez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Esmiralda Gomez (Defendant); Maria Gomez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Michael Odjaghian (Plaintiff); As to: Esmiralda Gomez (Defendant); Service Date: 05/10/2022; Service Cost: 135.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Michael Odjaghian (Plaintiff); As to: Maria Gomez (Defendant); Service Date: 05/09/2022; Service Cost: 135.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Michael Odjaghian (Plaintiff); As to: Esmiralda Gomez (Defendant); Maria Gomez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 04/18/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Michael Odjaghian (Plaintiff); As to: Esmiralda Gomez (Defendant); Maria Gomez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Michael Odjaghian (Plaintiff); As to: Esmiralda Gomez (Defendant); Maria Gomez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROCK CAMERON Y