This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/13/2022 at 05:46:21 (UTC).

MICHAEL MIRAULA VS CHEESECAKE FACTORY RESTAURANTS INC., A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/22/2021 MICHAEL MIRAULA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CHEESECAKE FACTORY RESTAURANTS INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9032

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIRAULA MICHAEL

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

CHEESECAKE FACTORY RESTAURANTS INC. A CORPORATION

Cross Defendant

ROES 1-50 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHICHPORTICH STEPHAN J.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

CLANCEY CLIFFORD A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/22/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

11/4/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

12/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/27/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

12/27/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

12/27/2021: Cross-Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2024
  • Hearing10/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • Hearing04/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • Hearing04/07/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Cheesecake Factory Restaurants Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Cheesecake Factory Restaurants Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Cheesecake Factory Restaurants Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Cheesecake Factory Restaurants Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Michael Miraula (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michael Miraula (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michael Miraula (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michael Miraula (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael Miraula (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHEESECAKE FACTORY RESTAURANTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHICHPORTICH STEPHAN J.