This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/13/2023 at 02:21:16 (UTC).

MICHAEL MIRABAL VS MONIQUE AYALA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/10/2022 MICHAEL MIRABAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MONIQUE AYALA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1113

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIRABAL MICHAEL

Defendants

AYALA MONIQUE

SMART & FINAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROCK CAMERON Y.

Defendant Attorney

VIEIRA LORI L.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/10/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/10/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/10/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/10/2022: Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/30/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

1/6/2023: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/6/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

1/6/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2023
  • Hearing08/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F47 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Monique Ayala (Defendant); As to: Michael Mirabal (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Monique Ayala (Defendant); Smart & Final Stores Corporation Erroneously Sued As Smart & Final (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Smart & Final Stores Corporation Erroneously Sued As Smart & Final (Defendant); As to: Michael Mirabal (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Michael Mirabal (Plaintiff); As to: Monique Ayala (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/16/2022; Service Cost: 155.92; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Michael Mirabal (Plaintiff); As to: Monique Ayala (Defendant); Smart & Final (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Michael Mirabal (Plaintiff); As to: Monique Ayala (Defendant); Smart & Final (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Michael Mirabal (Plaintiff); As to: Monique Ayala (Defendant); Smart & Final (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F47

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Melvin D. Sandvig in Department F47 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less