Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/12/2020 at 07:28:06 (UTC).

MICHAEL MCDONNELL VS CONCORD PLAZA TOWNHOMES CONDOMINIUMS

Case Summary

On 09/11/2019 MICHAEL MCDONNELL filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CONCORD PLAZA TOWNHOMES CONDOMINIUMS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1167

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MCDONNELL MICHAEL

MCDONNELL AN INDIVIDUAL MICHAEL

Defendant

CONCORD PLAZA TOWNHOMES CONDOMINIUMS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHULAK MICHAEL T

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AND/OR WHY MONETARY SANCTIO...) OF 03/10/2020

3/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AND/OR WHY MONETARY SANCTIO...) OF 03/10/2020

Order - Dismissal

3/10/2020: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AND/OR WHY MONETARY SANCTIO...)

3/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AND/OR WHY MONETARY SANCTIO...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

2/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 02/10/2020

2/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 02/10/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE FAIL...)

12/2/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE FAIL...)

Amended Complaint

10/24/2019: Amended Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/24/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/11/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/11/2019: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/11/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/11/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/16/2019: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/16/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (and/or why Monetary Sanctions in the amount of $500.00 (five-hundred dollars) should not be imposed as to plaintiff and their counsel for failure to serve and failure to appear on 02/10/2020) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal and/or why Monetary Sanctio...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal and/or why Monetary Sanctio...) of 03/10/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (Failure to Comply with Trial Court Delay Reduction Act) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...) of 02/10/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (Failure to Comply with Trial Court Delay Reduction Act) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service Fail...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint; Filed by Michael McDonnell, an individual (Plaintiff); Michael McDonnell, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michael McDonnell, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael McDonnell, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michael McDonnell, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michael McDonnell, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHULAK MICHAEL T.