This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/19/2021 at 15:38:49 (UTC).

MICHAEL MARINA VS GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 MICHAEL MARINA filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7879

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARINA MICHAEL

Defendants

BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM USA CORPORATION INC.

COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

CVS PHARMACY INC.

GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC

PFIZER INC.

RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY

RITE AID CORPORATION

SANOFI US SERVICES INC.

SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC

THE VONS COMPANIES

WALGREEN CO.

WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOWITT ANN

Defendant Attorney

DIXON ROBERT KENNETH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • Hearing12/02/2021 at 1:45 PM in Department 11 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Add On to JCCP5150 (Zantac)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF ADDITION OF CASE TO JCCP 5150); Filed by THE VONS COMPANIES (Defendant); CVS PHARMACY, INC. (Defendant); COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail (of Summons Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Inc.); Filed by Michael Marina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (of Summons Rite Aid Corporation); Filed by Michael Marina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (of Nunc Pro Tunc Order); Filed by Michael Marina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (of Nunc Pro Tunc Order); Filed by Michael Marina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (Summons Rite Aid Corporation); Filed by Michael Marina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (Summons CVS Pharmacy, Inc.); Filed by Michael Marina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (Summons Costco Wholesale Corporation); Filed by Michael Marina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2021
  • Docketat 10:58 AM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 10/29/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • Docketat 3:31 PM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/21/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michael Marina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michael Marina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael Marina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Michael Marina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM USA CORPORATION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE VONS COMPANIES INC DBA PAVILIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, a Washington Corporation is a litigant