This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2021 at 20:14:39 (UTC).

MICHAEL MAKARA VS KEITH O'CONNOR, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/23/2020 MICHAEL MAKARA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KEITH O'CONNOR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY GREEN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9060

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAKARA MICHAEL

Defendants

AEGIS FINANCIAL SOLUTIONS LLC.

IDEAL TALENT AGENCY A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

O'CONNOR KEITH

AFSC DEVELOPERS LLC

ADULT FILM STAR CONTENT A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

AFSC LLC

HAYDEN RYAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEUTHE ERIC B

Defendant Attorney

WARDA MICHAEL SAMUEL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/21/2021: Request for Dismissal

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

7/15/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)

6/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)

Other - - COURT ORDER FOR MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION HEARING HELD 6/22/21

6/22/2021: Other - - COURT ORDER FOR MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION HEARING HELD 6/22/21

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION) OF 06/22/2021

6/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION) OF 06/22/2021

Motion to Compel Arbitration

5/27/2021: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Answer

6/4/2021: Answer

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

6/9/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Reply - REPLY PETITIONERS RYAN HAYDEN AND IDEAL TALENT AGENCYS REPLY TO RESPONDENT MICHAEL MAKARAS OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION AND STAYING THE PROCEEDING

6/15/2021: Reply - REPLY PETITIONERS RYAN HAYDEN AND IDEAL TALENT AGENCYS REPLY TO RESPONDENT MICHAEL MAKARAS OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION AND STAYING THE PROCEEDING

Joinder to Motion - JOINDER TO MOTION IN RYAN HAYDEN AND IDEAL TALENT AGENCY'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY OF ACTION

6/17/2021: Joinder to Motion - JOINDER TO MOTION IN RYAN HAYDEN AND IDEAL TALENT AGENCY'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY OF ACTION

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/27/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/29/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/23/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/23/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/23/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/23/2020: Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by MICHAEL MAKARA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by MICHAEL MAKARA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCourt Order for Motion to Compel Arbitration hearing held 6/22/21; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration) of 06/22/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketJoinder to Motion (in Ryan Hayden and Ideal Talent Agency's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay of Action); Filed by KEITH O'CONNOR (Defendant); AEGIS FINANCIAL SOLUTIONS LLC. (Defendant); AFSC LLC (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketReply (Petitioners Ryan Hayden and Ideal Talent Agencys Reply to Respondent Michael Makaras Opposition to Petition for an Order Compelling Arbitration and Staying the Proceeding); Filed by RYAN HAYDEN (Defendant); IDEAL TALENT AGENCY, a business entity form unknown (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketOpposition (to Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration); Filed by MICHAEL MAKARA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by RYAN HAYDEN (Defendant); IDEAL TALENT AGENCY, a business entity form unknown (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by MICHAEL MAKARA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by MICHAEL MAKARA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by MICHAEL MAKARA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MICHAEL MAKARA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MICHAEL MAKARA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MICHAEL MAKARA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF ERIC BRYAN SEUTHE