This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2020 at 23:03:03 (UTC).

MICHAEL M. NESTER VS SUZANNE E. WINDUS

Case Summary

On 04/05/2018 MICHAEL M NESTER filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SUZANNE E WINDUS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are OTHER DISTRICT JUDGE, LAURA A. MATZ and CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8118

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

OTHER DISTRICT JUDGE

LAURA A. MATZ

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

NESTER MICHAEL M.

ROBERT D. FEIGHNER

Defendant and Respondent

WINDUS SUZANNE E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SCHACHTER ROBERT B.

SCHACHTER ROBERT BAILEY

Defendant Attorneys

PARKER IBRAHIM & BERG LLC

STERN HEATHER ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROPOSED JUDGMENT)

7/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROPOSED JUDGMENT)

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

7/25/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Condensed Narrative/Settled Statement on Appeal

9/26/2019: Condensed Narrative/Settled Statement on Appeal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER MOTION FOR SETTLED STATEMENT)

11/15/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER MOTION FOR SETTLED STATEMENT)

Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTIONS OF DEFENDANT SUZANNE E. WINDUS TO (REVISED) PROPOSED SETTLED STATEMENT

12/10/2019: Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTIONS OF DEFENDANT SUZANNE E. WINDUS TO (REVISED) PROPOSED SETTLED STATEMENT

Order - ORDER (REVISED) SETTLED STATEMENT AND ORDER

1/21/2020: Order - ORDER (REVISED) SETTLED STATEMENT AND ORDER

Appeal - Notice of Default Issued - APPEAL - NOTICE OF DEFAULT ISSUED "R1"

2/10/2020: Appeal - Notice of Default Issued - APPEAL - NOTICE OF DEFAULT ISSUED "R1"

Appeal - Clerk's Notice of Abandonment of Appeal - APPEAL - CLERK'S NOTICE OF ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL NOA:09/04/20

3/3/2020: Appeal - Clerk's Notice of Abandonment of Appeal - APPEAL - CLERK'S NOTICE OF ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL NOA:09/04/20

Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal - APPEAL - NOTICE OF FEES DUE FOR CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL 8/28/19 B300546

3/3/2020: Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal - APPEAL - NOTICE OF FEES DUE FOR CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL 8/28/19 B300546

Summons

4/5/2018: Summons

Case Management Statement -

8/15/2018: Case Management Statement -

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/29/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/21/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER SETTING MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE:) OF 05/21/2019

5/21/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER SETTING MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE:) OF 05/21/2019

Trial Brief

5/22/2019: Trial Brief

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

5/28/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits

5/30/2019: Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits

Request for Judicial Notice

5/30/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketAppeal Record Delivered; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 1 Volume Certified (for Notice of Appeal, filed 8/28/19); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid (APPELLANT PAID $201.89)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Clerk's Notice of Abandonment of Appeal (NOA:09/04/20); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal (8/28/19 B300546); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Abandonment of Appeal filed on 09/04/2019); Filed by MICHAEL M. NESTER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Default Issued ("R1"); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:9/4/19; "R1"); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Settled Statement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order (Revised) Settled Statement and Order filed 01/21/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by MICHAEL M. NESTER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketNotice (of OSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: EC068118    Hearing Date: November 15, 2019    Dept: E

MOTION FOR SETTLED STATEMENT

[CRC Rule 8.137.]

Date: 11/15/19

Case: Michael M. Nester v. Suzanne E. Windus (EC 068118)

TENTATIVE RULING:

With respect to plaintiff/appellant Michael Nester’s Motion for Settled Statement As to Proceedings on May 28, 2019, the Court finds that the proposed statement does not contain material required under CRC Rule 8.137(d). Accordingly, pursuant to Rule 8.137 (f)(3)(A), the Court orders plaintiff/appellant Michael M. Nester to prepare a new proposed statement. The proposed statement shall contain “a statement of the points the appellant is raising on appeal” and must also “[h]ave attached to it a copy of the judgment or order being appealed.” The proposed statement must be served and filed by December 13, 2019.

Within twenty days after plaintiff/appellant serves the new proposed statement, defendant/respondent Suzanne E. Windus may serve and file proposed amendments to the proposed statement.

No later than ten days after defendant/respondent files proposed amendments or the time to do so expires, whichever is earlier, a party may request a hearing to review and correct the proposed statement.  No hearing will be held unless ordered by this Court, and the Court will not ordinarily order a hearing unless there is a factual dispute about a material aspect of the trial court proceedings.   The parties are ordered not to schedule any further hearings concerning the proposed statement without a Court order.