This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2022 at 17:48:58 (UTC).

MICHAEL LEVAND, ET AL. VS ABB, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/29/2019 MICHAEL LEVAND, filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ABB, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STUART M. RICE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0594

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEVAND MICHAEL

LEVAND CHERYL

Defendants

ABB INC.

GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY INC.

ROCKWELL AUTOMATION INC.

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC.

GLOBAL MARINE INC.

SIEMENS INDUSTRY INC.

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

PUGET SOUND COMMERCE CENTER INC.

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

CERTAIN-TEED CORPORATION

JOHN CRANE INC.

HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY

VIGOR SHIPYARDS INC.

SCHLUMBERGER LIMITED

ASTRA FLOORING COMPANY

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROSENTHAL DEBORAH R.

COOK PAUL C

Defendant Attorneys

BARONIAN ROBERT HAIG

BRYDON JOHN R.

DUFFY JOSEPH

FOLEY PATRICK J.

HAKE WILLIAM M.

HUGO EDWARD R.

KARREN BRENT M.

KHARE VIIU SPANGLER

PIETRYKOWSKI MICHAEL J.

POND FRANK D.

PRINDLE KENNETH B.

RAJAZI LEILA R.

WEGLARZ CLAIRE C.

WHITEHEAD HENRY L.

BROSAMLE ANTHONY D.

DEJARDIN BRADFORD J.

YARON GEORGE D.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/8/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

11/8/2019: Request for Dismissal

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PAUL C. COOK ISO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 36 (A) FOR ORDER GRANTING PREFERENCE IN SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL

11/26/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PAUL C. COOK ISO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 36 (A) FOR ORDER GRANTING PREFERENCE IN SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL

Message Board Posting - MESSAGE BOARD POSTING REGARDING NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING

11/26/2019: Message Board Posting - MESSAGE BOARD POSTING REGARDING NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING

Motion for Trial Preference - MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING TRIAL-SETTING PREFERENCE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTIONS 36(A) & 36.5

11/26/2019: Motion for Trial Preference - MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING TRIAL-SETTING PREFERENCE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTIONS 36(A) & 36.5

Opposition - DEFENDANT ROCKWELL AUTOMATION INC.'S CONDITIONAL NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING TRIAL SETTING PREFERENCE

12/19/2019: Opposition - DEFENDANT ROCKWELL AUTOMATION INC.'S CONDITIONAL NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING TRIAL SETTING PREFERENCE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ERIN M. CARPENTER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION LLC'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTIONS 36(A) AND 36.5

12/20/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ERIN M. CARPENTER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION LLC'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTIONS 36(A) AND 36.5

Response - UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD CO.'S RESPONSE TO AND CONDITIONAL NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PREFERENCE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 36(A)

12/20/2019: Response - UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD CO.'S RESPONSE TO AND CONDITIONAL NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PREFERENCE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 36(A)

Opposition - DEFENDANT SIEMENS INDUSTRY INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TRIAL-SETTING PREFERENCE PURSUANT TO C.C.P 36(A) & 36.5

12/20/2019: Opposition - DEFENDANT SIEMENS INDUSTRY INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TRIAL-SETTING PREFERENCE PURSUANT TO C.C.P 36(A) & 36.5

Opposition - DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION LLC'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 36(A) AND 36.5

12/20/2019: Opposition - DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION LLC'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 36(A) AND 36.5

Opposition - DEFENDANT SCHLUMBERGER LIMITED'S CONDITIONAL OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING TRIAL-SETTING PREFERENCE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTIONS 36(A) AND 36.5

12/20/2019: Opposition - DEFENDANT SCHLUMBERGER LIMITED'S CONDITIONAL OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING TRIAL-SETTING PREFERENCE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTIONS 36(A) AND 36.5

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

12/23/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFFS' TO OPPOSITIONS TO MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING TRIAL-SETTING PREFERENCE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 36(A) & 36.5; MEMORANDUM OR POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

12/30/2019: Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFFS' TO OPPOSITIONS TO MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING TRIAL-SETTING PREFERENCE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 36(A) & 36.5; MEMORANDUM OR POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PAUL C. COOK IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO OPPOSITIONS TO MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING TRIAL-SETTING PREFERENCE

12/30/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PAUL C. COOK IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO OPPOSITIONS TO MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING TRIAL-SETTING PREFERENCE

Notice - PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' DECLARATION OF PAUL C. COOK IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO OPPOSITIONS TO MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING TRIAL-SETTING PREFERENCE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIV

12/31/2019: Notice - PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' DECLARATION OF PAUL C. COOK IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO OPPOSITIONS TO MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING TRIAL-SETTING PREFERENCE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIV

Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF PAUL C. COOK IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING TRIAL-SETTING PREFERENCE

1/3/2020: Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF PAUL C. COOK IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING TRIAL-SETTING PREFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CI...)

1/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CI...)

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

1/7/2020: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

310 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2022
  • Hearing04/28/2022 at 1:45 PM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • Hearing04/28/2022 at 1:45 PM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 15, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Status Conference ((Simmons Hanly Conroy)) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference (Simmons Hanly Conroy))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by CBS Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 15, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Status Conference ((Simmons Hanly Conroy)) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference (Simmons Hanly Conroy))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (With Prejudice); Filed by Michael Levand (Plaintiff); Cheryl Levand (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
343 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Order Assigning Case); Filed by Michael Levand (Plaintiff); Cheryl Levand (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketSummons on First Amended Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/04/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Michael Levand (Plaintiff); Cheryl Levand (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint for Personal Injury-Asbestos; Filed by Michael Levand (Plaintiff); Cheryl Levand (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michael Levand (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael Levand (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PUGET SOUND COMMERCE CENTER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where VIGOR SHIPYARDS INC. FKA TODD PACIFIC SHIPYARD CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Schlumberger LTD is a litigant

Latest cases where GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY INC is a litigant