This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/06/2023 at 22:13:43 (UTC).

MICHAEL LEIPSITZ VS DENISE LEIPSITZ

Case Summary

On 03/07/2022 MICHAEL LEIPSITZ filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DENISE LEIPSITZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHANIE M. BOWICK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8196

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHANIE M. BOWICK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEIPSITZ MICHAEL

Defendants

LEIPSITZ DENISE

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT TITLE ESTATE LIEN OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFF'S TITLE OR ANY CLOUD UPON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TALKOV SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER INTERLOCUTORY JUDGEMENT OF PARTITIO...)

2/24/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER INTERLOCUTORY JUDGEMENT OF PARTITIO...)

Notice - NOTICE OF RECORDING OF LIS PENDENS

12/5/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF RECORDING OF LIS PENDENS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER INTERLOCUTORY JUDGEMENT OF PARTITIO...)

12/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER INTERLOCUTORY JUDGEMENT OF PARTITIO...)

Request for Dismissal

11/30/2022: Request for Dismissal

Motion re: - MOTION RE: FOR INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT OF PARTITION AND APPOINTMENT OF REFEREE; DECLARATIONS OF MICHAEL LEIPSITZ, SCOTT TALKOV, AND MATTHEW TAYLOR

11/8/2022: Motion re: - MOTION RE: FOR INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT OF PARTITION AND APPOINTMENT OF REFEREE; DECLARATIONS OF MICHAEL LEIPSITZ, SCOTT TALKOV, AND MATTHEW TAYLOR

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

9/29/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF FERDEZA ZEKIRI IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE POS

9/26/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF FERDEZA ZEKIRI IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE POS

Case Management Statement

9/26/2022: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/14/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE AMENDED

9/14/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE AMENDED

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

7/25/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/20/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

7/18/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/11/2022

7/11/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/11/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/11/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/17/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/7/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2023
  • Hearing05/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • Hearing03/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing - Other Motion ? Other Interlocutory Judgment of Partition by Sale and Appointment of Referee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketHearing - Other Motion Other Interlocutory Judgment of Partition by Sale and Appointment of Referee scheduled for 03/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other Interlocutory Judgement of Partitio...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion - Other Interlocutory Judgement of Partition by Sale and Appointment of Referee scheduled for 02/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19 updated: Result Date to 02/24/2023; Result Type to Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Recording of Lis Pendens; Filed by: Michael Leipsitz (Plaintiff); As to: Denise Leipsitz (Defendant); ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFF'S TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD UPON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion - Other Interlocutory Judgement of Partition by Sale and Appointment of Referee scheduled for 02/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Michael Leipsitz on 03/07/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Michael Leipsitz as to ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFF'S TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD UPON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other Interlocutory Judgement of Partitio...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion - Other Interlocutory Judgement of Partition by Sale and Appointment of Referee scheduled for 12/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 02/24/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketAddress for Scott Talkov (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephanie M. Bowick in Department 19 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Michael Leipsitz (Plaintiff); As to: Denise Leipsitz (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Michael Leipsitz (Plaintiff); As to: Denise Leipsitz (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******8196 Hearing Date: December 1, 2022 Dept: 19

The Hearing on Motion – Other Interlocutory Judgment of Partition by Sale and Appointment of Referee is CONTINUED to March 28, 2023, at 8:30 a.m. in Department 19 of the Stanley Mosk Courthouse. The hearing on Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment is advanced from May 23, 2023 and CONTINUED TO August 15, 2023, at 8:30 a.m.

The Court cannot yet rule on the instant motion because it is not clear if Plaintiff has complied with all the applicable requirements of Code of Civil Procedure sections 872.010 et seq.

First, it is not clear whether Plaintiff, immediately upon filing the Complaint, recorded a notice of the pendency of the action. (See Code Civ. Proc., 872.250.) Plaintiff is ordered to file proof that the notice was recorded by March 17, 2023.

Second, Plaintiff has joined as defendants “All Persons Unknown, Claiming Any Legal Or Equitable Right, Title, Estate, Lien, Or Interest In The Property Described In The Complaint Adverse To Plaintiff's Title, Or Any Cloud Upon Plaintiff's Title Thereto.” (Compl., 5; see Code Civ. Proc., 872.510, 872.520 & 877.550.) Code of Civil Procedure section 872.310, subdivision (b) requires that these defendants be served by publication. (Code Civ. Proc., 872.310.) However, there is no indication that these defendants were served by publication. Plaintiff is ordered to serve these defendants by obtaining an order for publication that complies with Code of Civil Procedure section 872.310 and 872.320 and to file proof of such service by March 17, 2023.

Notice waived as to Defendant Denise Leipsitz, who is in default.