This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/07/2021 at 12:27:09 (UTC).

MICHAEL L. MOORE VS CYNTHIA S. RUHL

Case Summary

On 10/18/2019 MICHAEL L MOORE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CYNTHIA S RUHL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0935

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOORE MICHAEL L.

Defendant

RUHL CYNTHIA S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HINSHAW DAVID C

Defendant Attorney

BENAVIDES JOEL L.

 

Court Documents

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

3/23/2021: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

3/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

Notice of Ruling

3/24/2021: Notice of Ruling

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

2/18/2021: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

2/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE

10/27/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE

Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE APPROXIMATELY 90 DAYS.

7/28/2020: Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE APPROXIMATELY 90 DAYS.

Response - DECLARATION OF DAVID C. HINSHAW IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

3/27/2020: Response - DECLARATION OF DAVID C. HINSHAW IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND VACATING OSC

4/1/2020: Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND VACATING OSC

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL AND REQUEST FOR ELECTRONIC SERVICE

4/2/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL AND REQUEST FOR ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

2/5/2020: Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Answer - DEFENDANT CYNTHIA S. RUHLS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF MICHAEL L. MOORES UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

12/17/2019: Answer - DEFENDANT CYNTHIA S. RUHLS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF MICHAEL L. MOORES UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Request for Refund / Order

12/24/2019: Request for Refund / Order

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/25/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/5/2019: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/18/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/18/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/18/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • Hearing05/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Cynthia S. Ruhl (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Cynthia S. Ruhl (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Cynthia S. Ruhl (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Cynthia S. Ruhl (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • Docketat 10:46 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation & [Proposed] Order Continuing CMC); Filed by Cynthia S. Ruhl (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketJoint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Continuing Hearing Date for Case Management Conference and Order to Show Cause Hearing; Filed by Cynthia S. Ruhl (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order; Filed by Cynthia S. Ruhl (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketDEFENDANT CYNTHIA S. RUHL?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF MICHAEL L. MOORE?S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; Filed by Cynthia S. Ruhl (Defendant); Cynthia S. Ruhl (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (of Summons); Filed by Michael L. Moore (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michael L. Moore (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michael L. Moore (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael L. Moore (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19TRCV00935    Hearing Date: March 23, 2021    Dept: M

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Southwest District

Torrance Dept. M

MICHAEL L. MOORE,

Plaintiff,

Case No.:

19TRCV000935

vs.

[Tentative] RULING

CYNTHIA S. RUHL,

Defendant.

Hearing Date: March 23, 2021

Moving Parties: Attorney Joel L. Benavides, Esq. and Greenberg, Whitcombe, Takeuchi & Gibson, LLP, representing defendant Cynthia S. Ruhl

Responding Party: None

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

The court considered the moving papers.

RULING

The motion is GRANTED. The court orders that the attorney is relieved as counsel of record for defendant Cynthia S. Ruhl, effective upon the filing of the proof of service of the signed “Order Granting Attorney’s Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel – Civil” (Judicial Council form MC-053) upon the client.

BACKGROUND

On October 18, 2019, plaintiff Michael L. Moore filed a complaint against Cynthia S. Ruhl for breach of written partnership agreement, breach of contract, breach of fiduciary duty, dissolution of partnership agreement, accounting, and financial elder abuse.

A CMC is set for May 28, 2021.

LEGAL STANDARD

The court has discretion to allow an attorney to withdraw, and such a motion should be granted provided that there is no prejudice to the client and it does not disrupt the orderly process of justice. See Ramirez v. Sturdevant (1994) 21 Cal. App. 4th 904, 915; People v. Prince (1968) 268 Cal. App. 2d 398.

CRC Rule 3.1362 (Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel) requires (1) notice of motion and motion to be directed to the client (made on the Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel—Civil form (MC-051)); (2) a declaration stating in general terms and without compromising the confidentiality of the attorney-client relationship why a motion under Code of Civil Procedure section 284(2) is brought instead of filing a consent under Code of Civil Procedure section 284(1) (made on the Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel—Civil form (MC-052)); (3) service of the notice of motion and motion and declaration on all other parties who have appeared in the case; and (4) the proposed order relieving counsel (prepared on the Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel—Civil form (MC-053)).

DISCUSSION

Defendant Cynthia S. Ruhl’s attorney of record, Joel L. Benavides, Esq. and Greenberg, Whitcombe, Takeuchi & Gibson, LLP seek to be relieved as counsel.

Counsel states in his declaration that there has been an irreconcilable breakdown in the attorney-client relationship such that counsel cannot continue representation in this action consistent with its professional and ethical obligations and the client is delinquent in payment for legal services and costs relating to this action.

The court finds that the attorney submitted a declaration establishing that the service requirements of California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1362, have been satisfied. The court also finds that the attorney has shown sufficient reasons why the motion to be relieved as counsel should be granted and why the attorney has brought a motion under Code of Civil Procedure § 284(2) instead of filing a consent under § 284(1).

The motion is GRANTED.

Moving counsel is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOEL L. BENAVIDES