Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/21/2019 at 06:47:39 (UTC).

MICHAEL KARMI VS LG TRUCKING ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/20/2018 MICHAEL KARMI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LG TRUCKING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0812

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

KARMI MICHAEL

Defendants and Respondents

LG TRUCKING

DOES 1 TO 25

ESTRADA MAYNOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MICHAEL MILLMAN & ASSOCIATES

MILLMAN MICHAEL LEE

Defendant Attorney

LOFTIS GARY

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (JURY TRIAL) OF 12/20/2019

12/20/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (JURY TRIAL) OF 12/20/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

12/20/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

Order - Dismissal

12/20/2019: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH -

7/12/2018: ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH -

SUMMONS -

6/20/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND PROPERTY DAMAGE

6/20/2018: COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND PROPERTY DAMAGE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Jury Trial) of 12/20/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by LG Trucking (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael Karmi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND PROPERTY DAMAGE

    Read MoreRead Less