This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2021 at 02:20:24 (UTC).

MICHAEL JOSEPH METCALF VS YUSEN LOGISTICS (AMERICAS) INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2021 MICHAEL JOSEPH METCALF filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against YUSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN I. JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0512

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANN I. JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

METCALF MICHAEL JOSEPH

Defendants

YUSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS INC.

YUSEN LOGISTICS CO. LTD. DBA YUSEN LOGISTICS GROUP A CALIFORNIA COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOLOUKI SHOHAM JOSEPH

Defendant Attorney

CHAMMAS DANIEL B.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

9/15/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Other - - NOTICE OF NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW ON OCTOBER 25, 2021

8/20/2021: Other - - NOTICE OF NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW ON OCTOBER 25, 2021

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT) OF 08/05/2021

8/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT) OF 08/05/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

8/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

Notice of Removal to Federal Court - DEFENDANT YUSEN LOGISTICS CO., LTD.'S NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND STATE COURT OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION

7/26/2021: Notice of Removal to Federal Court - DEFENDANT YUSEN LOGISTICS CO., LTD.'S NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND STATE COURT OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/1/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • Hearing10/25/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 11 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Non-Appearance Case Review on October 25, 2021; Filed by Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc. (Defendant); Yusen Logistics Co., LTD. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department 11; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Removal to Federal Court) of 08/05/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Removal to Federal Court)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDefendant Yusen Logistics Co., Ltd.'s Notice to All Parties and State Court of Removal of Civil Action; Filed by Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc. (Defendant); Yusen Logistics Co., LTD. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michael Joseph Metcalf (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael Joseph Metcalf (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YUSEN LOGISTICS is a litigant

Latest cases where YUSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAMMAS DANIEL B.