This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/29/2021 at 14:20:58 (UTC).

MICHAEL JOSEPH METCALF VS YUSEN LOGISTICS (AMERICAS) INC., A NEW WORK CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 MICHAEL JOSEPH METCALF filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against YUSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS INC , A NEW WORK CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8695

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSEPH METCALF MICHAEL

Defendants

YUSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS INC. A NEW WORK CORPORATION

YUSEN LOGISTICS CO. LTD. A CALIFORNIA COMPANY DBA YUSEN LOGISTICS GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

SOLOUKI SHOHAM J.

CHAMMAS DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/4/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/4/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

9/7/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL CHAMMAS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT YUSEN LOGISTICS (AMERICAS) INC.'S MOTION TO STAY ACTION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 410.30

9/7/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL CHAMMAS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT YUSEN LOGISTICS (AMERICAS) INC.'S MOTION TO STAY ACTION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 410.30

Motion for Stay of Proceedings

9/7/2021: Motion for Stay of Proceedings

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • Hearing01/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • Hearing11/23/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Daniel Chammas in Support of Defendant Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc.'s Motion to Stay Action Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 410.30); Filed by YUSEN LOGISTICS (AMERICAS) INC., A NEW WORK CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketMotion for Stay of Proceedings; Filed by YUSEN LOGISTICS (AMERICAS) INC., A NEW WORK CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by YUSEN LOGISTICS (AMERICAS) INC., A NEW WORK CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MICHAEL JOSEPH METCALF (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MICHAEL JOSEPH METCALF (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MICHAEL JOSEPH METCALF (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YUSEN LOGISTICS is a litigant

Latest cases where YUSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAMMAS DANIEL B.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOLOUKI SHOHAM J.