This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/07/2021 at 12:13:34 (UTC).

MICHAEL JOHN NORRIS VS FCA US LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 MICHAEL JOHN NORRIS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD L. FRUIN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5058

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD L. FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORRIS MICHAEL JOHN

Defendants

WEST VALLEY CHRYSLER JEEP

FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AYVAZIAN SALLY A

RUBEN DAVID N.

AYVAZIAN SALLY A.

Defendant Attorney

BRIGNONI SAMANTHA

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/24/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

1/15/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

1/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/25/2021

1/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/25/2021

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/30/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Answer

10/21/2020: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/23/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

9/25/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/14/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/14/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/14/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/14/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (- Entire action/complaint, with prejudice); Filed by Michael John Norris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Case Management Conference ([Lemon Law]) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • Docketat 2:47 PM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/25/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Michael John Norris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Michael John Norris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketAnswer (- Defendant's FCA's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint); Filed by FCA US LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Michael John Norris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michael John Norris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michael John Norris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael John Norris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEST VALLEY CHRYSLER JEEP is a litigant

Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUBEN DAVID N. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AYVAZIAN SALLY A