This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/29/2021 at 00:02:34 (UTC).

MICHAEL JAMES, ET AL. VS JEMR MANAGEMENT LLC, A LIMIT LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 MICHAEL JAMES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JEMR MANAGEMENT LLC, A LIMIT LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BERNIE C. LAFORTEZA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0385

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BERNIE C. LAFORTEZA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JAMES MICHAEL

WALKER CHEYENNE

Defendant

JEMR MANAGEMENT LLC A LIMIT LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KELLENER JOSEPH WIND

Defendant Attorney

ORONSAYE CHRISTIAN I.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/24/2021: Complaint

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/24/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/24/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/24/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/24/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

4/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/21/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER]

7/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER]

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

8/9/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

Case Management Order

7/27/2021: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME)

9/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME)

Notice of Ruling

9/22/2021: Notice of Ruling

Motion to Quash Service of Summons

9/21/2021: Motion to Quash Service of Summons

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME

9/21/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • Hearing10/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U, Bernie C. LaForteza, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for an Order Shortening Time) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by JEMR Management LLC, a limit liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketMotion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by JEMR Management LLC, a limit liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (for an Order Shortening Time); Filed by JEMR Management LLC, a limit liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Continuance); Filed by Michael James (Plaintiff); Cheyenne Walker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U, Bernie C. LaForteza, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Case Management Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Michael James (Plaintiff); Cheyenne Walker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Michael James (Plaintiff); Cheyenne Walker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael James (Plaintiff); Cheyenne Walker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michael James (Plaintiff); Cheyenne Walker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michael James (Plaintiff); Cheyenne Walker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ORONSAYE CHRISTIAN I