This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/22/2023 at 06:41:52 (UTC).

MICHAEL J. LIBMAN, ET AL. VS LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/17/2023 MICHAEL J LIBMAN, filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5962

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL J. LIBMAN APC

LIBMAN MICHAEL J.

Defendants

ABBOTT AMELIA

ANDERSON BRANDON

CHAPA MARLA

GAMERO KRISTINA

GARCIA URIEL

LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE

NINO JUAN

REISGAARD THOMAS

SAGE FORENSIC INVESTIGATIONS

Not Classified By Court

JONES ANTWON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIBMAN MICHAEL J.

Not Classified By Court Attorney

KABATECK BRIAN S.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/17/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/17/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Summons on Complaint

3/17/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/17/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/17/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

3/17/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

3/17/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/29/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/29/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Lien

6/7/2023: Notice of Lien

Notice (name extension) Notice of Errata re Notice of Lien

6/7/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of Errata re Notice of Lien

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/9/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/9/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)

7/27/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)

Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)

10/25/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/07/2024

Hearing02/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2024

Hearing02/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023

DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023

DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 76 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 02/07/2024 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023

DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 76 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 02/07/2024 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023

DocketUpdated -- Brian S. Kabateck (Attorney): Middle Name changed from Stephen to S.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023

DocketAddress for Brian S. Kabateck (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023

DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023

DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 76 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 10/25/2023 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023

DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 76 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 10/25/2023 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
03/20/2023

DocketUpdated -- Complaint: As To Parties changed from MARLA CHAPA (Defendant), BRANDON ANDERSON (Defendant), URIEL GARCIA (Defendant), AMELIA ABBOTT (Defendant), LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE, entity form unknown (Defendant), SAGE FORENSIC INVESTIGATIONS, entity form unknown (Defendant), KRISTINA GAMERO (Defendant), JUAN NINO (Defendant), LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Defendant), THOMAS REISGAARD (Defendant) to Juan Nino (Defendant), Kristina Gamero (Defendant), Thomas Reisgaard (Defendant), Uriel Garcia (Defendant), Marla Chapa (Defendant), Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Defendant), Brandon Anderson (Defendant), Sage Forensic Investigations (Defendant), Amelia Abbott (Defendant), Liberty Mutual Insurance (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023

DocketUpdated -- Civil Case Cover Sheet: As To Parties changed from LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE, entity form unknown (Defendant), URIEL GARCIA (Defendant), LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Defendant), MARLA CHAPA (Defendant), BRANDON ANDERSON (Defendant), KRISTINA GAMERO (Defendant), SAGE FORENSIC INVESTIGATIONS, entity form unknown (Defendant), JUAN NINO (Defendant), AMELIA ABBOTT (Defendant), THOMAS REISGAARD (Defendant) to Kristina Gamero (Defendant), Liberty Mutual Insurance (Defendant), Brandon Anderson (Defendant), Marla Chapa (Defendant), Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Defendant), Amelia Abbott (Defendant), Juan Nino (Defendant), Uriel Garcia (Defendant), Sage Forensic Investigations (Defendant), Thomas Reisgaard (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: MICHAEL J. LIBMAN (Plaintiff); LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL J. LIBMAN, APC. a California Professional Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Defendant); LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE, entity form unknown (Defendant); JUAN NINO (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Christopher K. Lui in Department 76 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MICHAEL J. LIBMAN (Plaintiff); LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL J. LIBMAN, APC. a California Professional Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Defendant); LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE, entity form unknown (Defendant); JUAN NINO (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MICHAEL J. LIBMAN (Plaintiff); LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL J. LIBMAN, APC. a California Professional Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Defendant); LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE, entity form unknown (Defendant); JUAN NINO (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less