This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2021 at 00:32:41 (UTC).

MICHAEL GRANT VS STARBUCKS CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/09/2018 MICHAEL GRANT filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against STARBUCKS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD E. RICO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1969

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD E. RICO

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

GRANT MICHEAL

Defendants and Respondents

STARBUCKS CORPORATION

HAWTHORNE CITY OF

DOES 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

KAUFMAN & KAUFMAN

1001 North Ross Street

Santa Ana, CA 92701-3315

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

DARROW TANJA L. ESQ.

633 West 5Th Street, 63Rd Floor

Los Angeles,, CA 90071-0000

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

7/9/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES BASED UPON FALSE IMPRISONMENT; CIVIL ACTION FOR DEPRIVATION OF RIGHTS; NEGLIGENCE; TNTENTIONAL INFLICTION OP EMOTIONAL DISTRESS; NEGLIGENT INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS; DEFAM

7/9/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES BASED UPON FALSE IMPRISONMENT; CIVIL ACTION FOR DEPRIVATION OF RIGHTS; NEGLIGENCE; TNTENTIONAL INFLICTION OP EMOTIONAL DISTRESS; NEGLIGENT INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS; DEFAM

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

7/9/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

DEFENDANT STARBUCKS CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

8/17/2018: DEFENDANT STARBUCKS CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

8/13/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/13/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DEFENDANT STARBUCKS CORPORATION'S FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

9/7/2018: DEFENDANT STARBUCKS CORPORATION'S FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

11/6/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for failure to appear, may ...)

12/7/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for failure to appear, may ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of 11/06/2018

11/6/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of 11/06/2018

Notice - NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

10/16/2018: Notice - NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (sanctions for failure to appear, may include dismissal) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for failure to appear, may ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of 11/06/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketNotice (to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-10-03 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketAmended Answer to Complaint; Filed by Starbucks Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT STARBUCKS CORPORATION'S FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Starbucks Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT STARBUCKS CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Micheal Grant (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES BASED UPON FALSE IMPRISONMENT; CIVIL ACTION FOR DEPRIVATION OF RIGHTS; NEGLIGENCE; TNTENTIONAL INFLICTION OP EMOTIONAL DISTRESS; NEGLIGENT INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS; DEFAMATION PER SE; VIOLATION OF UNRUH CIVIL RIGHTS ACT (CIVI

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HAWTHORNE CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where Starbucks Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DARROW TANJA LAVONNE