This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/05/2023 at 19:27:31 (UTC).

MICHAEL GOLDBERG, VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 MICHAEL GOLDBERG, filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7366

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOLDBERG MICHAEL

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

A STUDIO LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZUCKERMAN PAUL S.

Defendant Attorneys

SCHMIDT CHRISTINA MAILING

KAPLAN JEFFREY S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2024
  • Hearing11/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2024
  • Hearing05/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2024
  • Hearing05/14/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: A STUDIO, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant); As to: MICHAEL GOLDBERG, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Answer: As To Parties changed from MICHAEL GOLDBERG, (Plaintiff) to MICHAEL GOLDBERG, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: CITY OF LOS ANGELES, a public entity (Defendant); As to: MICHAEL GOLDBERG, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: CITY OF LOS ANGELES, a public entity (Defendant); As to: ROES 1 to 10, Inclusive (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketSummons Cross-Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CITY OF LOS ANGELES, a public entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: CITY OF LOS ANGELES, a public entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: MICHAEL GOLDBERG, (Plaintiff); As to: A STUDIO, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/12/2023; Service Cost: 159.92; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 11/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MICHAEL GOLDBERG, (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF LOS ANGELES, a public entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MICHAEL GOLDBERG, (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF LOS ANGELES, a public entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/14/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less