Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2021 at 17:28:45 (UTC).

MICHAEL GILBERT, ET AL. VS JOSE DEL CARMEN RAMIREZ VALADEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/22/2020 MICHAEL GILBERT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSE DEL CARMEN RAMIREZ VALADEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0661

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SMITH DOUG

GILBERT MICHAEL

TOOMER DEWAYN

Defendants

J.A.R. TRUCKING LLC

VALADEZ JOSE DEL CARMEN RAMIREZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEINER JON MATTHEW

Defendant Attorney

MARCIA MELVIN F.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

4/23/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Order - ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION

4/23/2021: Order - ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON STIPULATION GRANTING DEFENDANT LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

4/30/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON STIPULATION GRANTING DEFENDANT LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Answer

4/30/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/18/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

12/18/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Answer

12/30/2020: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

11/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

11/13/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/22/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/22/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/22/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/22/2020: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2023
  • Hearing10/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • Hearing04/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • Hearing04/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jose Del Carmen Ramirez Valadez (Defendant); J.A.R. Trucking and Son, LLC. Erroneously Sued As J.A.R. Trucking LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Order on Stipulation Granting Defendant Leave to File First Amended Answer to Unverified Complaint); Filed by Jose Del Carmen Ramirez Valadez (Defendant); J.A.R. Trucking and Son, LLC. Erroneously Sued As J.A.R. Trucking LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to File First Amended Answer to Complaint); Filed by Jose Del Carmen Ramirez Valadez (Defendant); J.A.R. Trucking and Son, LLC. Erroneously Sued As J.A.R. Trucking LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketOrder (Granting Stipulation); Filed by Jose Del Carmen Ramirez Valadez (Defendant); J.A.R. Trucking and Son, LLC. Erroneously Sued As J.A.R. Trucking LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jose Del Carmen Ramirez Valadez (Defendant); J.A.R. Trucking and Son, LLC. Erroneously Sued As J.A.R. Trucking LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Michael Gilbert (Plaintiff); Doug Smith (Plaintiff); Dewayn Toomer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Michael Gilbert (Plaintiff); Doug Smith (Plaintiff); Dewayn Toomer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michael Gilbert (Plaintiff); Doug Smith (Plaintiff); Dewayn Toomer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael Gilbert (Plaintiff); Doug Smith (Plaintiff); Doug Smith (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michael Gilbert (Plaintiff); Doug Smith (Plaintiff); Doug Smith (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARCIA MELVIN F.