This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2019 at 01:44:36 (UTC).

MICHAEL FLUKE VS RANDY BRAGG ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/21/2018 MICHAEL FLUKE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RANDY BRAGG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2993

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLUKE MICHAEL

Defendants

SLADE KEVIN

BRAGG RANDY

KKOL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GENTRY GALEN M. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

VEENEMAN CATHERINE A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

2/19/2019: Judgment

Minute Order

2/19/2019: Minute Order

Certificate of Mailing for

2/19/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Notice

2/27/2019: Notice

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

2/27/2019: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Notice of Ruling

2/6/2019: Notice of Ruling

Opposition

1/10/2019: Opposition

Minute Order

1/24/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/28/2019: Minute Order

Certificate of Mailing for

1/28/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

SUMMONS

9/21/2018: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

9/21/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

COMPLAINT

9/21/2018: COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Mail

10/9/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

10/9/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Personal Service

10/9/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/18/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/01/2019

Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2019

Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2019

Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2019

Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2019

DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by Randy Bragg (Defendant); Kevin Slade (Defendant); Kkol, Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2019

DocketNotice (Notice of Entry of Judgment Pursuant to Court Order); Filed by Randy Bragg (Defendant); Kevin Slade (Defendant); Kkol, Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/19/2019

Docketat 11:10 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Court Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/19/2019

DocketJudgment (Pursuant to Court Order); Filed by Randy Bragg (Defendant); Kevin Slade (Defendant); Kkol, Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/19/2019

DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/19/2019

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 02/19/2019); Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
10/18/2018

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2018

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2018

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2018

DocketProof of Service Summons; Filed by Michael Fluke (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2018

DocketProof of Service Summons; Filed by Michael Fluke (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2018

DocketProof of Personal Service (Proof of Service Summons); Filed by Michael Fluke (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2018

DocketSUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2018

DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2018

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2018

DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael Fluke (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less