This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2022 at 12:02:46 (UTC).

MICHAEL FLOREZ VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 MICHAEL FLOREZ filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4744

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLOREZ MICHAEL

Defendants

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

LADAFF FAMILY TRUST

LADAFF MOHAMMAD KHADIGEH

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

LADAFF FAMILY TRUST

LADAFF MOHAMMAD KHADIGEH

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 20 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BOOKER ROBERT L.

MENDOZA ANDRES L.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LEON LUCIO OCEGUEDA

WHITAKER RONALD STEPHEN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/6/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Change of Firm Name

5/31/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

2/23/2022: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)

11/15/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing - NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING MUST BE SIGNED BY ALL COUNSEL

10/12/2021: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing - NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING MUST BE SIGNED BY ALL COUNSEL

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/27/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Cross-Complaint

10/27/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

10/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION RE: FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IN 21STCV24744; [PROPOSED] ORDER

11/9/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION RE: FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IN 21STCV24744; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Answer

10/19/2021: Answer

Request - REQUEST REQUEST FOR STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FROM PLAINTIFF MICHAEL FLOREZ

9/28/2021: Request - REQUEST REQUEST FOR STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FROM PLAINTIFF MICHAEL FLOREZ

Answer

9/28/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/30/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

9/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/30/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

8/19/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2024
  • Hearing07/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • Hearing01/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • Hearing12/20/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Michael Florez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Michael Florez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed by Michael Florez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (2nd)); Filed by Michael Florez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION RE: FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IN 21STCV24744; [PROPOSED] ORDER); Filed by Michael Florez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Mohammad Khadigeh Ladaff (Defendant); Ladaff Family Trust (Defendant); State of California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Mohammad Khadigeh Ladaff (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Michael Florez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Michael Florez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Michael Florez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Michael Florez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michael Florez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michael Florez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael Florez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEON LUCIO