This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2019 at 03:08:42 (UTC).

MICHAEL FIERRO ET AL VS WALTER BURNHAM MD ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/10/2017 MICHAEL FIERRO filed an Other lawsuit against WALTER BURNHAM MD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0457

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

FIERRO MICHAEL

FIERRO RITA

Defendants and Respondents

BURNHAM WALTER. M.D.

MONROVIA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

DOES 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DAY DAY & BROWN

Defendant Attorneys

STOCKALPER PATRICK E. ESQ.

LAMB MICHAEL V. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/17/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, MONROVIA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR NEGLIGENCE

3/14/2017: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, MONROVIA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR NEGLIGENCE

Unknown

3/14/2017: Unknown

DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY PURSUANT TO SECTION 9 OF THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION STANDARDS

3/14/2017: DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY PURSUANT TO SECTION 9 OF THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION STANDARDS

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

3/14/2017: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/7/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

4/12/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Proof of Service

4/21/2017: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

4/21/2017: Proof of Service

APPENDIX I OF II OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION OF DEFENDANT WALTER H. BURNHAM, M.D.

12/21/2017: APPENDIX I OF II OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION OF DEFENDANT WALTER H. BURNHAM, M.D.

APPENDIX II OF II OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION OF DEFENDANT WALTER H. BURNHAM, M.D.

12/21/2017: APPENDIX II OF II OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION OF DEFENDANT WALTER H. BURNHAM, M.D.

NOTICE OF MOTION AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION OF DEFENDANT WALTER H. BURNHAM, M.D.

12/21/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION OF DEFENDANT WALTER H. BURNHAM, M.D.

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS AND EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION OF DEFENDANT WALTER H. BURNHAM, M.D.

12/21/2017: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS AND EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION OF DEFENDANT WALTER H. BURNHAM, M.D.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

1/30/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT WALTER H. BURNHAM, M.D.

2/5/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT WALTER H. BURNHAM, M.D.

Unknown

3/9/2018: Unknown

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

4/5/2018: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

NOTICE OF SIGNED ORDER RE TRIAL/FSC HEARING DATES CONTINUED

4/13/2018: NOTICE OF SIGNED ORDER RE TRIAL/FSC HEARING DATES CONTINUED

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketJudgment Following General Verdict; Filed by Monrovia Memorial Hospital (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial and Related Dates) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF TREVORJ.HERRERA); Filed by Michael Fierro (Plaintiff); Rita Fierro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application to C...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Walter., M.D. Burnham (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketMotion in Limine (No.9 to Preclude Plaintiffs's Witnesses from Questioning and Argument Based on "Reptile Theory"); Filed by Walter., M.D. Burnham (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketMotion in Limine (No.8 To Limit Plaintiffs' Experts to Opinions Expressed at Depo); Filed by Walter., M.D. Burnham (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketMotion in Limine (No.7 to Preclude Improper Expert Testimony on Direct About Literature); Filed by Walter., M.D. Burnham (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Michael Fierro (Plaintiff); Rita Fierro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Michael Fierro (Plaintiff); Rita Fierro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Michael Fierro (Plaintiff); Rita Fierro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Michael Fierro (Plaintiff); Rita Fierro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE (MEDICAL MALPRACTICE) AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael Fierro (Plaintiff); Rita Fierro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****0457    Hearing Date: September 11, 2020    Dept: 29

Fierro et al. v. Burnham, M.D., et al.

Plaintiffs’ Three Motions to Compel Attendance and Testimony of Nonparty Witnesses Shahriar Jarchi, M.D.; Neha Patel, D.C; and Andrew Miles, D.C.; and Requests for Sanctions Against Each Deponent, are TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. The proofs of service attached to the motions do not indicate that the motions were served on the non-party witnesses. The Court also notes that any further motion to compel attendance and testimony of a non-party witness must affirmatively establish that service of the subpoena was properly effected pursuant to section 2020.220, subdivision (c).

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

   

NOTE:  PARTIES MUST APPEAR THIS DATE AS A TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE IS ALSO SET ON CALENDAR FOR THIS DATE. 

In order to comply with social distancing regulations, all parties are strongly encouraged to appear via video or telephonic services offered by the Court, through LACourtConnect.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MONROVIA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL is a litigant