Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2019 at 06:03:06 (UTC).

MICHAEL EUGENE TASSEY VS SEARS ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/15/2017 MICHAEL EUGENE TASSEY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SEARS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2459

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TASSEY MICHAEL EUGENE

Defendants and Respondents

SEARS AUTHORIZED HOMETOWN STORES LLC

SEARS BRANDS LLC

SEARS HOLDINGS MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

SEARS GRAND LLC

SEARS

SEARS HOLDINGS CORPORATION

SEARS ROEBUCK AND CO.

SEARS AUTO CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF COHEN & MARZBAN LC

 

Court Documents

Notice

11/19/2018: Notice

Proof of Personal Service

11/27/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/27/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/27/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/27/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order

12/21/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

12/21/2018: Unknown

Declaration

5/15/2019: Declaration

SUMMONS

8/15/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1.) GENERAL NEGLIGENCE 2.) PREMISES LIABILITY

8/15/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1.) GENERAL NEGLIGENCE 2.) PREMISES LIABILITY

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2019
  • Declaration ( Of Linda Diane Anderson Re: Status Of Bankruptcy And Request For Continuance Of Status Conference Of June 18, 2019); Filed by Sears, Roebuck and Co. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • at 3:30 PM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 12/21/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Minute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Michael Eugene Tassey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Michael Eugene Tassey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Michael Eugene Tassey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Michael Eugene Tassey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Notice (Of Bankruptcy Filing And Imposition Of Automatic Stay); Filed by Sears, Roebuck and Co. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1.) GENERAL NEGLIGENCE 2.) PREMISES LIABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Michael Eugene Tassey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC672459    Hearing Date: October 07, 2020    Dept: 29

Tassey v. Sears et al.

The unopposed Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff is GRANTED. Counsel has complied with the requirements of Cal Rules of Court 3.1362. The order shall be effective upon the filing of a proof of service of the signed order on the client. Cal Rules of Court 3.1362(e). Until then, counsel remains counsel of record for Plaintiff.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sears Brands Management Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where SEARS is a litigant

Latest cases where SEARS AUTHORIZED HOMETOWN STORES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SEARS HOLDKINGS CORPORATION is a litigant