This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/25/2021 at 14:28:59 (UTC).

MICHAEL ELIO FUSCO VS ELISE MICHELLE OUIMETTE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/22/2021 MICHAEL ELIO FUSCO filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ELISE MICHELLE OUIMETTE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9037

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FUSCO MICHAEL ELIO

Defendants

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

OUIMETTE ELISE MICHELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TOPCHYAN ARUTYUN

Defendant Attorney

MALLORY GEORGE LORENZO

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/22/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

11/5/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service

11/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

11/22/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

11/22/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2024
  • Hearing10/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • Hearing04/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • Hearing04/07/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Michael Elio Fusco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michael Elio Fusco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michael Elio Fusco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael Elio Fusco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOPCHYAN ARUTYUN