This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/12/2020 at 05:43:35 (UTC).

MICHAEL EDWARD TISCARENO ET AL VS GENOVEVA RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 02/21/2018 MICHAEL EDWARD TISCARENO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GENOVEVA RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4573

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

TISCARENO MICHAEL EDWARD

TISCARENO GRAZIELLA ANDREA

Defendants and Respondents

RODRIGUEZ GENOVEVA

DOES 1 - 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BOWLES BRADLEY R.

BOWLES BRADLEY RICHARD

Defendant Attorneys

DOHERTY JOHN JOSEPH

PORVIN TERRY

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDERS GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

8/19/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDERS GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

8/10/2020: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); HEARING ON MO...)

8/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); HEARING ON MO...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL) OF 06/16/2020

6/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL) OF 06/16/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

6/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/5/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

5/5/2020: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

5/5/2020: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

5/5/2020: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

5/5/2020: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE)

4/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JONATHAN LEE

1/23/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JONATHAN LEE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JONATHAN W LEE

9/25/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JONATHAN W LEE

Notice of Settlement

7/9/2019: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

7/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Answer

1/7/2019: Answer

Association of Attorney

5/17/2019: Association of Attorney

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAIN

4/3/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAIN

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • Hearing12/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice Of Entry Of Orders Granting Attorney's Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel); Filed by Michael Edward Tiscareno (Plaintiff); Graziella Andrea Tiscareno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement); Hearing on Mo...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Michael Edward Tiscareno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement); Hearing on Mo...) of 08/10/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Graziella Andrea Tiscareno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: notice of settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Michael Edward Tiscareno (Plaintiff); Graziella Andrea Tiscareno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Genoveva Rodriguez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Genoveva Rodriguez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Genoveva Rodriguez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Michael Edward Tiscareno (Plaintiff); Graziella Andrea Tiscareno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael Edward Tiscareno (Plaintiff); Graziella Andrea Tiscareno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC694573    Hearing Date: August 10, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

michael edward tiscareno, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

genoveva rodriguez,

Defendant.

Case No.: BC694573

Hearing Date: August 10, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion to be relieved as counsel

NOTICE

Department #32 will be dark for motions on August 10, 2020.  The parties are ordered to email the Court’s clerk at SSCDept32@lacourt.org to inform the clerk whether they are submitting on the Court’s tentative or whether they are requesting a hearing.  If any party requests a hearing, one will be scheduled.  If the parties do not email the Court’s clerk before the hearing time to request a hearing, they will waive the right to be heard and shall submit to this tentative order, which shall issue.

TENTATIVE ORDER

Attorney Bradley R. Bowles of Bowles & Verna LLP (“Counsel”) moves to be relieved as counsel for Plaintiffs Michael Tiscareno and Graziella Tiscareno (“Plaintiffs”). Counsel has filed forms MC-051 and MC-052 and has lodged with the Court copies of the proposed orders on form MC-053 as required. (Cal Rules of Court, rule 3.1362.) The basis for this motion is a conflict between Counsel and Plaintiffs. This is a proper basis for withdrawal.

Based upon the foregoing, Counsel’s motion to be relieved as counsel for Plaintiffs is granted. The Court sets the following dates:

Final Status Conference: September 23, 2021, at 10:00 a.m.

Trial: October 7, 2021, at 8:30 a.m.

The discovery and motions cut-offs shall be based on the new trial date. Counsel shall provide notice of this order, as well as the new dates, to all parties of record, including Plaintiffs. Counsel should note that the orders will become effective upon the filing of proof of service of signed copies of the orders on Plaintiffs. Counsel will remain the attorney of record until

DATED: August 10, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court