Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/21/2021 at 09:57:44 (UTC).

MICHAEL DARDON VS LEGENDS HOSPITALITY, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 MICHAEL DARDON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against LEGENDS HOSPITALITY, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD L. FRUIN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6822

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD L. FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DARDON MICHAEL

Defendant

LEGENDS HOSPITALITY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MESSRELIAN HAROUT

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/11/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

12/23/2020: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/8/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/16/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/16/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/16/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/16/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (- Entire action, with prejudice); Filed by Michael Dardon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Michael Dardon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ((Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michael Dardon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael Dardon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michael Dardon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEGENDS HOSPITALITY LLC is a litigant