This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/22/2020 at 08:06:41 (UTC).

MICHAEL CUELLAR VS VALMONT COMPOSITE STRUCTURES INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/23/2018 MICHAEL CUELLAR filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against VALMONT COMPOSITE STRUCTURES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARC D. GROSS, MASTER CALENDAR, LORI ANN FOURNIER, MARGARET MILLER BERNAL and BRIAN F. GASDIA. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5600

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARC D. GROSS

MASTER CALENDAR

LORI ANN FOURNIER

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

BRIAN F. GASDIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

CUELLAR MICHAEL

BRUSAVI BRUCE

Defendants, Respondents and Not Classified By Court

K.D. HALE CONSTRUCTION INC.

W.J. WHATLEY INC.

VALMONT COMPOSITE STRUCTURES INC.

DOES 1 TO 100

VALMONT INDUSTRIES INC. DOE1

VALMONT INDUSTRIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BRUSAVICH BRUCE M. ESQ.

AGNEW & BRUSAVICH

BRUSAVICH BRUCE MICHAEL ESQ.

BRUSAVICH BRUCE MICHAEL

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O'MEARA LLP

WHYTE NICOLE ESQ.

HAMRICK & EVANS LLP

KNOPFLER GEORGE

KELSBERG WILLIAM GRAHAM

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

2/23/2018: SUMMONS -

Notice of Settlement

1/21/2020: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER DEFENSE'S GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT)

1/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER DEFENSE'S GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GEORGE KNOPFLER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT K.D. HALE CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

12/10/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GEORGE KNOPFLER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT K.D. HALE CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JAMES PAZOS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT K.D. HALE CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

10/28/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JAMES PAZOS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT K.D. HALE CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT K.D. HALE CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

10/28/2019: Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT K.D. HALE CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANT K.D. HALE CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

10/28/2019: Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANT K.D. HALE CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Request for Judicial Notice - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS VALMONT COMPOSITE STRUCTURES, INC. AND VALMONT INDUSTRIES, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

10/31/2019: Request for Judicial Notice - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS VALMONT COMPOSITE STRUCTURES, INC. AND VALMONT INDUSTRIES, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Request - REQUEST TO EXCUSE PERSONAL APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANT K.D. HALE CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S REPRESENTATIVE AT MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; [PROPOSED] ORDER

11/13/2019: Request - REQUEST TO EXCUSE PERSONAL APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANT K.D. HALE CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S REPRESENTATIVE AT MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

12/3/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: ORDER

9/13/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: ORDER

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings -

7/20/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings -

Answer -

8/23/2018: Answer -

Notice of Ruling -

9/28/2018: Notice of Ruling -

VALMONT INDUSTRIES, INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

6/27/2018: VALMONT INDUSTRIES, INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT VALMONT COMPOSITE STRUCTURES, INC.'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

7/5/2018: DEFENDANT VALMONT COMPOSITE STRUCTURES, INC.'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Other - -

8/16/2018: Other - -

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

5/8/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • Hearing05/19/2020 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • Hearing05/05/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • Hearing02/25/2020 at 13:30 PM in Department C at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (With Prejudice as to Entire Action of All Parties and All Causes of Action); Filed by Michael Cuellar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by K.D. HALE CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (filed by K.D. HALE CONSTRUCTION, INC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by K.D. HALE CON...) of 02/04/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by K.D. HALE CON...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Michael Cuellar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (filed by VALMONT COMPOSITE STRUCTURES, INC) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by Valmont Composite Structures, Inc. (Defendant); Valmont Composite Structures, Inc. Erroneously Sued As VALMONT COMPOSITE STRUCTURES, INC., (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Michael Cuellar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael Cuellar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC695600    Hearing Date: February 25, 2020    Dept: SEC

CUELLAR v. VALMONT COMPOSITE STRUCTURES INC., et al.

CASE NO.:  BC695600

HEARING:  2/25/20

JUDGE: OLIVIA ROSALES

#7

TENTATIVE ORDER

Defendant Valmont Composite Structures Inc.’s motion for summary judgment is taken OFF-CALENDAR as moot. The court is in receipt of Plaintiff’s Notice of Settlement of Entire Case filed on 1/21/20.