This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2021 at 10:58:18 (UTC).

MICHAEL COUNTEE VS QIC US MANAGMENT, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/30/2021 MICHAEL COUNTEE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against QIC US MANAGMENT, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8195

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COUNTEE MICHAEL

Defendants

FEDERAL BUILDING SERVICES INC.

QIC US MANAGMENT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELLIS ANDREW

Defendant Attorney

GOBEL SEVAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/30/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

8/18/2021: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

8/9/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

8/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service

10/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

9/28/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

9/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2024
  • Hearing07/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • Hearing01/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • Hearing01/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MICHAEL COUNTEE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SOUTH BAY CENTER SPE, LLC Erroneously Sued As QIC US MANAGMENT, INC. (Defendant); FEDERAL BUILDING SERVICES, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MICHAEL COUNTEE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MICHAEL COUNTEE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MICHAEL COUNTEE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MICHAEL COUNTEE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MICHAEL COUNTEE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QIC US MANAGEMENT, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where FEDERAL BUILDING SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOBEL SEVAN ESQ.