This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/05/2022 at 20:52:48 (UTC).

MICHAEL COLBERT VS CITY OF LONG BEACH, A MUNICIPAL ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/19/2021 MICHAEL COLBERT filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CITY OF LONG BEACH, A MUNICIPAL ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK C. KIM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0555

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLBERT MICHAEL

Defendants

CITY OF LONG BEACH A MUNICIPAL ENTITY

COOK JOEL

ERDELJI MICHAEL

JARMAN WILLIAM

NEVEL ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JORGENSEN RICHARD

Defendant Attorney

YASUDA MARSHA M.

 

Court Documents

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

12/28/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/19/2021: Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

3/2/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/7/2022: Case Management Statement

Request for Judicial Notice

1/27/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

1/27/2022: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Proof of Personal Service

11/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/22/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/22/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/24/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/30/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/20/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/20/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2022
  • Hearing10/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department S27 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • Hearing10/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department S27 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • Hearing07/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department S27 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Michael Colbert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by City of Long Beach, a municipal entity (Defendant); Michael Erdelji (Defendant); Joel Cook (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by City of Long Beach, a municipal entity (Defendant); Michael Erdelji (Defendant); Joel Cook (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by City of Long Beach, a municipal entity (Defendant); Michael Erdelji (Defendant); Joel Cook (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Michael Colbert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Michael Colbert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Michael Colbert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Michael Colbert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michael Colbert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michael Colbert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael Colbert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF LONG BEACH is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JORGENSEN RICHARD ALLEN