This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/07/2022 at 18:36:51 (UTC).

MICHAEL CHASE, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 MICHAEL CHASE filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2154

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHASE MICHAEL

MALIBU APOTHECARY LLC

PRINCE CHRISTOPHER

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN ARI SCOTT

Defendant Attorneys

HUESTON JOHN

HUESTON JOHN C.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/19/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/19/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION)

2/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION) OF 02/10/2022

2/10/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION) OF 02/10/2022

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/9/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP)

2/9/2022: Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP)

Unknown - DECLARATION RE: ADD-ON ON PETITION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

2/9/2022: Unknown - DECLARATION RE: ADD-ON ON PETITION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Unknown - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

2/16/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Submission Re: Southern California Edison Company's Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case; Filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY (Defendant); EDISON INTERNATIONAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Complex Determination) of 02/10/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Complex Determination)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketPetition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP); Filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY (Defendant); EDISON INTERNATIONAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY (Defendant); EDISON INTERNATIONAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Re: Add-On on Petition (OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL?S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE); Filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY (Defendant); EDISON INTERNATIONAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael Chase (Plaintiff); Christopher Prince (Plaintiff); MALIBU APOTHECARY, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michael Chase (Plaintiff); Christopher Prince (Plaintiff); MALIBU APOTHECARY, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michael Chase (Plaintiff); Christopher Prince (Plaintiff); MALIBU APOTHECARY, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUESTON ESQ JOHN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUESTON JOHN CHARLES