This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/04/2021 at 04:50:46 (UTC).

MICHAEL CHACON VS 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 MICHAEL CHACON filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against 20/20 PLUMBING HEATING INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3963

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHACON MICHAEL

Defendants

MAHONEY MICHAEL

COCKEY BUCK

NORMAN JOHN

20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING INC.

SCHLOSSBERG DAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEGERIAN CARNEY RICHARD

Defendant Attorney

SORSHER BORIS

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER

7/20/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

7/2/2021: Case Management Statement

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

6/21/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/21/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CMC

6/21/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CMC

Case Management Statement

6/21/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

4/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/30/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/30/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/13/2021: Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • Hearing01/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Second Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint; [Proposed] Order); Filed by Michael Chacon (Plaintiff); 20/20 Plumbing & Heating Inc. (Defendant); John Norman (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by 20/20 Plumbing & Heating Inc. (Defendant); John Norman (Defendant); Michael Mahoney (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Michael Chacon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Michael Chacon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff?s Complaint); Filed by 20/20 Plumbing & Heating Inc. (Defendant); John Norman (Defendant); Michael Mahoney (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of CMC); Filed by Michael Chacon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Michael Chacon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Michael Chacon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Michael Chacon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Michael Chacon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Michael Chacon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michael Chacon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michael Chacon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael Chacon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shegerian, Carney R