Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/30/2020 at 09:21:02 (UTC).

MICHAEL BULOS HELO VS LAWRENCE ALAN JONAS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 MICHAEL BULOS HELO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LAWRENCE ALAN JONAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9500

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HELO MICHAEL BULOS

Defendants

JONAS LAWRENCE ALAN

KIEGEL SUSANNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMINPOUR ASHKAN KING

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/21/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/26/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

5/26/2020: PI General Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2023
  • Hearing05/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Hearing11/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • Hearing11/04/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michael Bulos Helo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael Bulos Helo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michael Bulos Helo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less