This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2022 at 16:16:53 (UTC).

MICHAEL BRANDT VS HEALTHPEAK PROPERTIES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 MICHAEL BRANDT filed an Other lawsuit against HEALTHPEAK PROPERTIES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0466

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRANDT MICHAEL

Defendants

HB MANAGER LLC

HCP S-H LCS OPCO LLC

HEALTHPEAK PROPERTIES INC.

KESHISHYAN VARSENIK

SH NORTHRIDGE CA OPCO LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/27/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal

6/27/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/24/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/24/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

6/24/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/24/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Michael Brandt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michael Brandt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael Brandt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michael Brandt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Healthpeak Properties Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL