Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/27/2021 at 15:59:24 (UTC).

MICHAEL BILELLO VS CRESCENCIO REZA OCAMPO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 MICHAEL BILELLO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CRESCENCIO REZA OCAMPO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9462

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BILELLO MICHAEL

Defendants

WEBCO SWEEPING LLC

REZA OCAMPO CRESCENCIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAHMANI NICOLE

Defendant Attorney

HEPPENSTALL JESSICA

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING AMENDMENT TO ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

10/27/2020: Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING AMENDMENT TO ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Answer - ANSWER AMENDMENT TO ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

10/27/2020: Answer - ANSWER AMENDMENT TO ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Answer

10/27/2020: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: AMENDMENT TO ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER

10/27/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: AMENDMENT TO ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

9/24/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/21/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

7/10/2020: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/14/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

6/17/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/17/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint

5/21/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

5/28/2020: PI General Order

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2023
  • Hearing05/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Hearing11/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • Hearing11/04/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketAnswer (AMENDMENT TO ANSWER TO COMPLAINT); Filed by WEBCO SWEEPING, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Webco LB, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketOrder (PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING AMENDMENT TO ANSWER TO COMPLAINT); Filed by WEBCO SWEEPING, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (RE: AMENDMENT TO ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER); Filed by WEBCO SWEEPING, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Michael Bilello (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Michael Bilello (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Crescencio Reza Ocampo (Defendant); WEBCO SWEEPING, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Crescencio Reza Ocampo (Defendant); WEBCO SWEEPING, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Michael Bilello (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Michael Bilello (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michael Bilello (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michael Bilello (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael Bilello (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAHMANI NICOLE