This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2022 at 16:54:05 (UTC).

MICHAEL BELCHER, ET AL. VS MC CONSTRUCTION & DESIGN COMPONENTS, INC., AN UNKNOWN ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 MICHAEL BELCHER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MC CONSTRUCTION DESIGN COMPONENTS, INC , AN UNKNOWN ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HUEY P. COTTON. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0972

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HUEY P. COTTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BELCHER MICHAEL

BELCHER SUSANNE

Defendants

HADAD AVSHALOM

MC CONSTRUCTION & DESIGN COMPONENTS INC. AN UNKNOWN ENTITY

SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY A WHOLLY-OWNED SUBSIDIARY OF SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY A TEXAS CORPORATION

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY A SOUTH DAKOTA CORPORATION

Cross Plaintiff

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

Cross Defendants

CHEN SHALOM

MC CONSTRUCTION AND DESIGN A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SALCIDO RICHARD

HUNTER JOHN LOGAN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

HOWARD ELMIRA R.

PAGAN JOHN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal

3/28/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

3/16/2022: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

3/10/2022: Case Management Statement

Answer

11/4/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

11/5/2021: Cross-Complaint

Case Management Statement

11/12/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/12/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/16/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/15/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/15/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/15/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Ruling

12/15/2021: Notice of Ruling

General Denial

9/15/2021: General Denial

Proof of Personal Service

8/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/23/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Suretec Insurance Company (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Michael Belcher (Plaintiff); Susanne Belcher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Western Surety Company, a South Dakota corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Suretec Insurance Company (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Suretec Insurance Company (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Suretec Insurance Company (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Suretec Insurance Company (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Suretec Insurance Company Erroneously Sued As Suretec Indemnity Company, a wholly-owned subsidiary of Suretec Insurance Company, a Texas corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by Western Surety Company, a South Dakota corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Michael Belcher (Plaintiff); Susanne Belcher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Michael Belcher (Plaintiff); Susanne Belcher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Michael Belcher (Plaintiff); Susanne Belcher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michael Belcher (Plaintiff); Susanne Belcher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michael Belcher (Plaintiff); Susanne Belcher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael Belcher (Plaintiff); Susanne Belcher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MC CONSTRUCTION AND DESIGN A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Western Surety Company is a litigant