This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2023 at 07:05:47 (UTC).

MICHAEL AKHTARZAD VS K360 STUDIO CITY MANAGEMENT, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/08/2022 MICHAEL AKHTARZAD filed a Contract - Business Governance lawsuit against K360 STUDIO CITY MANAGEMENT, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE, DAVID J. COWAN and MARY H. STROBEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2957

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business Governance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

DAVID J. COWAN

MARY H. STROBEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AKHTARZAD MICHAEL

Defendants

K360 STUDIO CITY MANAGEMENT LLC

LA360 LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENSTEIN MICHAEL HARRIS

Defendant Attorney

KELLY PATRICK W.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

3/20/2023: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

3/3/2023: Case Management Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/3/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

2/16/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/19/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/12/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/21/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

12/2/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/1/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES;)

10/4/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES;) OF 10/04/2022

10/4/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES;) OF 10/04/2022

Case Management Statement

9/26/2022: Case Management Statement

Answer

9/28/2022: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/15/2022

8/15/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/15/2022

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

8/15/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

8/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2024
  • Hearing06/03/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2024
  • Hearing05/28/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2024
  • Hearing01/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Michael Akhtarzad (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/03/2024 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/28/2024 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketPost-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for 01/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketTrial Preparation Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 24 updated: Result Date to 03/03/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (COURT ORDER) of 08/15/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Michael Akhtarzad (Plaintiff); As to: K360 Studio City Management, LLC (Defendant); LA360 LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Michael Akhtarzad (Plaintiff); As to: K360 Studio City Management, LLC (Defendant); LA360 LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Michael Akhtarzad (Plaintiff); As to: K360 Studio City Management, LLC (Defendant); LA360 LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Michael Akhtarzad (Plaintiff); As to: K360 Studio City Management, LLC (Defendant); LA360 LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mary H. Strobel in Department 82 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less