This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2021 at 00:46:10 (UTC).

MICHAEL ADASKAVEG, ET AL. VS FORD MOTOR COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 MICHAEL ADASKAVEG filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2253

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DONLAN ANN

ADASKAVEG MICHAEL

Defendants

SOUTH BAY FORD

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOLIN TIONNA

Defendant Attorneys

MORTENSON MICHAEL DONN

MORTENSON MICHAEL D.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

9/8/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/8/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/14/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

7/14/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/14/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/14/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

4/21/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/30/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

5/20/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/30/2021: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • Hearing09/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Ford Motor Company (Defendant); South Bay Ford (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Michael Adaskaveg (Plaintiff); Ann Donlan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 76, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 76, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Ford Motor Company (Defendant); South Bay Ford (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Michael Adaskaveg (Plaintiff); Ann Donlan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Michael Adaskaveg (Plaintiff); Ann Donlan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ford Motor Company (Defendant); South Bay Ford (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Michael Adaskaveg (Plaintiff); Ann Donlan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Michael Adaskaveg (Plaintiff); Ann Donlan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michael Adaskaveg (Plaintiff); Ann Donlan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael Adaskaveg (Plaintiff); Ann Donlan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michael Adaskaveg (Plaintiff); Ann Donlan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORTENSON MICHAEL D