This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2021 at 04:45:01 (UTC).

MICAH MANUEL VS BURBANK UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 11/08/2017 MICAH MANUEL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BURBANK UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2802

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

MANUEL MICAH

ESPANA ROSE

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 TO 10

BURBANK UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

EASYTURE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

TORKZADEH REZA

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

QUIGLEY LANE ESQ.

CLINTON DAVID A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/5/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - NOT ENTERED

9/11/2020: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - NOT ENTERED

Declaration - DECLARATION CONFIRMATION AND PROOF OF ANNUITY FUNDING

7/27/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION CONFIRMATION AND PROOF OF ANNUITY FUNDING

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

4/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

4/21/2020: Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

3/20/2020: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE)

3/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF LANE QUIGLEY RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

1/24/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF LANE QUIGLEY RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TRACY R. HORN RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

1/29/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TRACY R. HORN RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) (CONDITIONAL -...)

1/31/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) (CONDITIONAL -...)

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

2/13/2020: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 09/24/2019

9/24/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 09/24/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

9/24/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Notice of Settlement

9/24/2019: Notice of Settlement

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION (SET ONE)

7/19/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION (SET ONE)

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BURBANK UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION (SET ONE)

7/12/2019: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BURBANK UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION (SET ONE)

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

7/12/2019: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Separate Statement

7/12/2019: Separate Statement

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (For Failure to Prosecute within 3yrs) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (as to Entire Action and Proof of Funding of Annunity) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Micah Manuel (Plaintiff); Rose Espana (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (- Not Entered); Filed by Micah Manuel (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Confirmation and Proof of Annuity Funding); Filed by Micah Manuel (Plaintiff); Rose Espana (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (as to Entire Action and Proof of Funding of Annunity) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Status of Petition to Approve a Minor's Compromise) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) ((conditional - Approval of Minor's Compromise)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketAPPLICAT1ON AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL EX PARTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Micah Manuel (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. PREMISES LIABILITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****2802    Hearing Date: March 11, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

MICAH MANUEL,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

BURBANK UNIFIED SCHOOL DIST., et al.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: ****2802

[TENTATIVE] ORDER CONDITIONALLY GRANTING PETITIONER’S PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF MINOR

Dept. 31

1:30 p.m.

March 11, 2020

Plaintiff, Micah Manuel, a minor by and through his GAL, Rose Espana, filed this action against Defendants, Burbank Unified School District and Easy Turf, Inc. for damages arising out of a playground accident. Plaintiff suffered a left distal fibula fracture and ankle sprain as a result of the incident, but has recovered completely from his injuries at this time.

Plaintiff, by and through his GAL and attorney, has agreed to settle this action with Defendants for the total amount of $60,000. If approved, $20,000 will be used for attorneys’ fees, $5985.10 for medical expenses, and $2775.14 for costs of suit. Petitioner proposes to use the net settlement amount of $31,239.76 to purchase a single premium deferred annuity.

The Court has reviewed the settlement and finds it is fair and reasonable. The Court cannot locate required Attachment 14a, which would be a declaration from Counsel explaining the basis for the fees sought. The Court understands the parties have a retainer agreement providing for a 33.3% attorneys’ fee. The Court does not, however, typically award attorneys’ fees in excess of 25% in cases involving minors absent extraordinary efforts on the part of Counsel.

Per CRC 7.952, Petitioner and Plaintiff must appear at the hearing unless the Court finds good cause to excuse their appearance. Plaintiff is thirteen years old, and the Court will therefore require him to personally appear and testify. If the Court is satisfied with Plaintiff’s and Petitioner’s testimony at the hearing, and if Counsel agrees to reduce fees to 25%, the petition will be granted, and the Court will sign the proposed orders to approve the settlement and place funds in a blocked account (with amounts adjusted accordingly), both of which were lodged with the petition.

Petitioner is ordered to give notice.

Dated this 11th day of March, 2020

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURBANK UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TORKZADEH REZA