This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2019 at 00:34:34 (UTC).

MIA SCARLETT GRECO SMITH ET AL VS PROVIDENCE SAINT JOSEPH

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 MIA SCARLETT GRECO SMITH filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against PROVIDENCE SAINT JOSEPH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7457

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SMITH KEVIN LEE

GRECO DESIRE SOPHIA

Defendants

RICHARD BARDOWELL M.D. INC

BARDOWELL RICHARD M.D.

PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM-SOUTHERN

Guardian Ad Litem

GRECO SOPHIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

CARROLL RICHARD D. ESQ.

TAYLOR DEMARCO LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

9/27/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

SUMMONS

10/19/2017: SUMMONS

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

9/22/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/17/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/17/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/17/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DECLARATION OF HEATHER L. HAMMER PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 430.41, SUBDIVISION (A)(2)

12/8/2017: DECLARATION OF HEATHER L. HAMMER PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 430.41, SUBDIVISION (A)(2)

Unknown

12/4/2017: Unknown

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/28/2017: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEFENDANTS, RICHARD BARDO WELL, M.D.; RICHARD BARDO WELL, M.D., INC'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

12/27/2017: DEFENDANTS, RICHARD BARDO WELL, M.D.; RICHARD BARDO WELL, M.D., INC'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT, PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM-SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA DBA PROVIDENCE SAINT JOSEPH MEDICAL CENTER

1/8/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT, PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM-SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA DBA PROVIDENCE SAINT JOSEPH MEDICAL CENTER

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

1/8/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (on Motion for Summary Judgment); Filed by PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM-SOUTHERN - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment); Filed by PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM-SOUTHERN - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment); Filed by PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM-SOUTHERN - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATIONS AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF DEFENDANTS, RICHARD BARDOWELL, M.D. AND RICHARD BARDOWELL, M.D., INC., FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT); Filed by RICHARD, M.D. BARDOWELL (Defendant); RICHARD BARDOWELL, M.D., INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Filed by RICHARD, M.D. BARDOWELL (Defendant); RICHARD BARDOWELL, M.D., INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by RICHARD, M.D. BARDOWELL (Defendant); RICHARD BARDOWELL, M.D., INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Adjudication/Summary Judgment) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment Adjudication/Summary J...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketJudgment by Court under CCP 437c; Filed by PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM-SOUTHERN - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by MIA SCARLETT GRECO SMITH (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DESIRE SOPHIA GRECO (Plaintiff); KEVIN LEE SMITH (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****7457    Hearing Date: December 18, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

mia scarlett greco-smith, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

providence saint joseph,

Defendant.

Case No.: ****7457

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

petition to approve compromise of pending action

The Court has reviewed the petitions by Petitioner Desiree Sophia Greco on behalf of Claimant Mia Scarlett Greco-Smith. Petitioner proposes to deduct $2,009.20 in medical expenses that Petitioner incurred from Claimant’s settlement. Petitioner cannot deduct those amounts from Claimants’ settlement, as these expenses were not for Claimants’ benefit. (See Prob. Code, ; 3601.) Likewise, Petitioner cannot seek to deduct a “cost reserve” of $865.67 in potential future costs, as those costs are speculative and have not been incurred for Claimant’s benefit. Therefore, the Court is prepared to approve the settlement without those costs.

DATED: December 18, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM-SOUTHERN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARROLL RICHARD D. ESQ.