This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/07/2022 at 21:21:01 (UTC).

MIA LALIAH MESA VS AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/03/2021 MIA LALIAH MESA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAREN NELSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4131

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAREN NELSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MESA MIA LALIAH

Defendants

AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES INC.

VETS SECURING AMERICA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KLEIN JEFFREY D.

AVILES DIEGO D.

EHSANI-NIA SARA

BIBIYAN DAVID D.

KEANE SARA A.

Defendant Attorney

QUALLS DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/3/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

2/1/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/1/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AT FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE

3/11/2022: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AT FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Initial Status Conference Report

3/2/2022: Initial Status Conference Report

Initial Status Conference Order

2/24/2022: Initial Status Conference Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/24/2022, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

2/24/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/24/2022, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/24/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

3/23/2022: Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Notice of Appearance - DEFENDANT AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES' NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

3/23/2022: Notice of Appearance - DEFENDANT AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES' NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/30/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2022
  • Hearing07/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 17 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketJoint Initial Status Conference Statement; Filed by Mia Laliah Mesa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketDefendant American Guard Services' Notice of Appearance; Filed by American Guard Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (at Further Status Conference); Filed by Mia Laliah Mesa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Report; Filed by Mia Laliah Mesa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • Docketat 3:57 PM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/24/2022, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Mia Laliah Mesa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Mia Laliah Mesa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mia Laliah Mesa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mia Laliah Mesa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mia Laliah Mesa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VETS SECURING AMERICA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KEANE SARA A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AVILES DIEGO D.