This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 06:11:49 (UTC).

MIA JEONG VS JAE RYUNG PAK, ET AL.,

Case Summary

On 12/12/2017 MIA JEONG filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JAE RYUNG PAK, . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LISA HART COLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8505

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LISA HART COLE

 

Party Details

Defendants

RHEE PIL SEUNG

CHO SUNG SUK

NA SOO HYON

WOOK SUN K.

CHI WOO HYUN

CHOI KAP SIL

HAN SUNG HUN

YI BYUNG DON

HWANG EUN KYUNG

HONG EUN SOOK

LEE JUNG K.

BAE KI YOUNG

KWON TAE SEUNG

YUN BUM SIK

PAK JAE RYUNG

LIM UI KYUN

KIM CHRISTINE

KIM MOON SUNG

NAM JIN HO

CHO NAM JIK

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

KIM JILL

ONE LAW CORPORATION

JAE KIM

 

Court Documents

Summons

12/12/2017: Summons

Unknown

12/20/2017: Unknown

Unknown

12/28/2017: Unknown

Unknown

12/28/2017: Unknown

Unknown

12/28/2017: Unknown

Unknown

12/28/2017: Unknown

Unknown

12/28/2017: Unknown

Unknown

12/28/2017: Unknown

Unknown

12/28/2017: Unknown

Unknown

12/28/2017: Unknown

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/31/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Unknown

2/27/2018: Unknown

Unknown

6/11/2018: Unknown

Substitution of Attorney

6/29/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Certificate (name extension)

10/15/2018: Certificate (name extension)

Declaration

10/19/2018: Declaration

Unknown

11/1/2018: Unknown

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/16/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; Order to Show Cause Re: (sanctions and/or dismissal for plaintiff's failure to appear at the hearing of 11/01/2018) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; Order to Show Cause Re: (sanctions and/or dismissal for plaintiff's failure to file proofs of service or obtain order for publication) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • Declaration (of Jill Kim RE: order to show cause re sanctions and/or dismissal for pltfs failure to file proofs of service); Filed by Mia Jeong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Mia Jeong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause re sanctions...) of 11/01/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause re sanctions...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Mia Jeong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Mia Jeong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Mia Jeong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Mia Jeong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Mia Jeong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mia Jeong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NA SOO HYON is a litigant