This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 20:14:07 (UTC).

MGP XI PROPERTIES, LLC VS Z WURST SCV I, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 MGP XI PROPERTIES, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Z WURST SCV I, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4259

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MGP XI PROPERTIES LLC

Defendants

LEE KIMBERLY

LEE ROBERT W.

THE GENERAL LEE LEGACY LLC

Z WURST SCV I LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DURINGER STEPHEN C.

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/28/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

11/8/2021: Request for Dismissal

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

11/8/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/8/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Application - APPLICATION APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

11/8/2021: Application - APPLICATION APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

11/8/2021: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT)

11/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT) OF 11/16/2021

11/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT) OF 11/16/2021

Judgment - JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT

11/16/2021: Judgment - JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

11/16/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/14/2021

10/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/14/2021

Proof of Personal Service

9/30/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/30/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/4/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/4/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/16/2021: Complaint

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • Docketat 3:26 PM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Default Judgment by Court) of 11/16/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Default Judgment by Court)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketJudgment (by Default by Court); Filed by MGP XI Properties, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketApplication (Application for Entry of Default Judgment by Court); Filed by MGP XI Properties, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by MGP XI Properties, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by MGP XI Properties, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by MGP XI Properties, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by MGP XI Properties, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MGP XI Properties, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MGP XI Properties, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MGP XI Properties, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MGP XI Properties, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MGP XI Properties, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MGP XI Properties, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MGP XI Properties, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MGP XI PROPERTIES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DURINGER STEPHEN C.