This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2019 at 02:47:06 (UTC).

MGK CONSULTANTS INC VS DUSTIN J LEE ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/16/2017 MGK CONSULTANTS INC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against DUSTIN J LEE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0153

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MGK CONSULTANTS INC.

Defendants

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

ALLY FINANCIAL DIS PER RED

LEE DUSTIN J. DIS PER M.O.

COPART INC. DIS PER RED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HONEY ROGER G. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RULING AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/9/2018: NOTICE OF RULING AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

6/27/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING AT POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFFRENCE

7/2/2018: NOTICE OF RULING AT POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFFRENCE

DEFENDANTS/CROSS-COMPLAINANTS ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY AND ALLSTATE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY'S SEPARATE STATEMENT TO ITS MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MGK CONSULTANTS, INC., A CALIFORNI

7/23/2018: DEFENDANTS/CROSS-COMPLAINANTS ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY AND ALLSTATE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY'S SEPARATE STATEMENT TO ITS MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MGK CONSULTANTS, INC., A CALIFORNI

DEFENDANIS/CROSS-COMPLAINANTS ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY AND ALLSTATE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY'S SEPARATE STATEMENT TO ITS MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MGK CONSULTANTS, INC., A CALIFORNI

7/23/2018: DEFENDANIS/CROSS-COMPLAINANTS ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY AND ALLSTATE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY'S SEPARATE STATEMENT TO ITS MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MGK CONSULTANTS, INC., A CALIFORNI

DEFENDANTS/CROSS-COMPLAINANTS ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY AND ALLSTATE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROG

7/23/2018: DEFENDANTS/CROSS-COMPLAINANTS ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY AND ALLSTATE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROG

DEFENDANTS/CROSS-COMPLAINANTS ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY AND ALLSTATE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY'S SEPARATE STATEMENT TO ITS MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL CROSS- DEFENDANT MIGUEL RAZO'S FURTHER RESPO

7/23/2018: DEFENDANTS/CROSS-COMPLAINANTS ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY AND ALLSTATE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY'S SEPARATE STATEMENT TO ITS MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL CROSS- DEFENDANT MIGUEL RAZO'S FURTHER RESPO

DEFENDANTS/CROSS-COMPLAINANTS ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY AND ALLSTATE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT JAMES P. MARQUARDT'S FURTHER RESP

7/23/2018: DEFENDANTS/CROSS-COMPLAINANTS ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY AND ALLSTATE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT JAMES P. MARQUARDT'S FURTHER RESP

DEFENDANTS/CROSS- COMPLAINANTS ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY AND ALLSTATE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO JUDICIAL COUNSE

7/23/2018: DEFENDANTS/CROSS- COMPLAINANTS ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY AND ALLSTATE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO JUDICIAL COUNSE

DEFENDANTS/CROSS-COMPLAINANTS ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY AND ALLSTATE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY'S SEPARATE STATEMENT TO ITS MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF JAMES MARQUARDT'S FURTHER RESPONSE

7/23/2018: DEFENDANTS/CROSS-COMPLAINANTS ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY AND ALLSTATE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY'S SEPARATE STATEMENT TO ITS MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF JAMES MARQUARDT'S FURTHER RESPONSE

DEFENDANTS/CROSS- COMPLAINANTS ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY AND ALLSTATE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY'S SEPARATE STATEMENT TO ITS MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MGK CONSULTANTS, INC., A CALIFORN

7/23/2018: DEFENDANTS/CROSS- COMPLAINANTS ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY AND ALLSTATE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY'S SEPARATE STATEMENT TO ITS MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MGK CONSULTANTS, INC., A CALIFORN

DBFENDANIS/CROSS- COMPLAINANTS ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY AND ALLSTATE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRO

7/23/2018: DBFENDANIS/CROSS- COMPLAINANTS ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY AND ALLSTATE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRO

Minute Order

8/28/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/29/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/29/2018: Minute Order

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

1/17/2018: ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Unknown

2/5/2018: Unknown

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

2/5/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2018
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 69; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 12; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) (Mandatory Settlement Conference; Case Deemed Settled) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 69; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) (Mandatory Settlement Conference; Transferred to different departmnt) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 69; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (MOTION - COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES; Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Defendant and Cross-Complainant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANTS/CROSS-COMPLAINANTS ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY AND ALLSTATE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY'S SEPARATE STATEMENT TO ITS MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MGK CONSULTANTS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, DBA COLLISION BODY SPECIALIST'S FURTHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANTS/CROSS- COMPLAINANTS ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY AND ALLSTATE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY'S SEPARATE STATEMENT TO ITS MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MGK CONSULTANTS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, DBA COLLISION BODY SPECIALIST'S FURTHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MGK Consultants, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT: 1. TO ENFORCE LIEN SALE RIGHTS; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

Robert D. Brugge, Bar No. 92532

‘ rdb%pclegal .com

‘ P, PETERSEN & CLARKE

550 North Brand Boulevard, Suite 1500 Glendale, California 91203- 1922 Telephone (818) 547-5000

Facsimile: (818) 547-5329

Attorneys for Defendants and Cross-complainants

'i".' eer

BURSFgr t,g urf'af qginerflsa boumy % Lo# Angsles

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinois Corporation, and ALLSTATE NORTHBROOK DEC -5 2017

INDEMNITY COMPANY, an Illinois Corporation

Cherri R. Carter, Exegutive Officer/Clerk herrl )

By s Deputy

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CAYTHORKIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, CENTRAL DISTRICT

MGK CONSULTANTS, INC., a California corporation,

Plaintiff, V.

DUSTIN J. LEE, an individual; ALLSTATE INSURANCE COI\/IPANY an I1linois Corporation; ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA, a California Corporation; ALLY FINANCIAL a Delaware Corporation; COPART, INC a Delaware Corporation; and Does 1- 50, inclusive,

Defendants.

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinois Corporation; ALLSTATE

NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY

COMPANY, an Illinois Corporation ,

Cross-complainants, V. |

MGK CONSULTANTS, INC., a Nevada corporation., dba COLLISION BODY SPECIALISTS MIGUEL RAZZ, an individual; JAMES P. MARQUARDT, an individual; and Does 1-50, inclusive,

Cross-defendants.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR POSSESSION OF PERSONAL

PROPERTY AND DAMAGES; CONVERSION; DECLARATORY

RELIEF

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR POSSESSION OF PERSONAL PROPERTY AND DAMAGES,; CONVERSION;

DECLARATORY RELIEF

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where Ally Financial Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HONEY ROGER