This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/31/2021 at 10:02:27 (UTC).

MG & AM INC. VS SIAVASH KHODADADI

Case Summary

On 05/29/2019 MG AM INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SIAVASH KHODADADI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8598

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

MG & AM INC. DBA AXIS HOME IMPROVEMENT

MG & AM INC.

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

MOVASSAGHI ABDORREZA

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

KHODADADI SIAVASH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHAFIE BEHROUZ

KHAEFI ALI

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

MELKONIAN GEOFFREY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

12/28/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/7/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Case Management Order

10/21/2020: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF DOE DEFENDANTS AND ROE C...)

10/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF DOE DEFENDANTS AND ROE C...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF DOE DEFENDANTS AND ROE C...) OF 10/21/2020, ADDENDUM RE: DISCOVERY

10/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF DOE DEFENDANTS AND ROE C...) OF 10/21/2020, ADDENDUM RE: DISCOVERY

Case Management Statement

10/5/2020: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/1/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

8/4/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT SIAVASH KHODADADIANS NOTICE OF NON- OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/14/2020: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT SIAVASH KHODADADIANS NOTICE OF NON- OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

4/16/2020: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Case Management Order

12/11/2019: Case Management Order

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/16/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE BY DEFENDANT S...)

12/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE BY DEFENDANT S...)

Case Management Statement

11/25/2019: Case Management Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

11/25/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATE

12/4/2019: Notice - NOTICE CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATE

Request for Judicial Notice

8/7/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Complaint

5/29/2019: Complaint

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2022
  • Hearing01/11/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • Hearing12/17/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • Hearing11/17/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Hearing04/12/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by MG & AM INC. (Plaintiff); MG & AM INC. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketMotion to Set Aside/Vacate Default; Filed by MG & AM INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Siavash Khodadadian Erroneously Sued As Siavash Khodadadi (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 39; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 39; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketOpposition (to Defendant's Demurrer to Complaint); Filed by MG & AM INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Siavash Khodadadi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike (to Complaint); Filed by Siavash Khodadadi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MG & AM INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MG & AM INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MG & AM INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MG & AM INC. DBA AXIS HOME IMPROVEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MELKONIAN GEOFFREY