This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2021 at 23:10:39 (UTC).

METRO GOLD LINE FOOTHILL EXTENSION CONSTRUCTION AUTHORITY VS TERRY N. HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE TERRY N. HILL AND MARTHA E. HILL TRUST OF 2007, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 METRO GOLD LINE FOOTHILL EXTENSION CONSTRUCTION AUTHORITY filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against TERRY N HILL, TRUSTEE OF THE TERRY N HILL AND MARTHA E HILL TRUST OF 2007. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4497

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

METRO GOLD LINE FOOTHILL EXTENSION CONSTRUCTION AUTHORITY

Defendants

RICE AN INDIVIDUAL E.D.

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY TITLE OR INTEREST IN OR TO THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED HEREIN

HILL TRUSTEE OF THE TERRY N. HILL AND MARTHA E. HILL TRUST OF 2007 MARTHA E.

A.T.M. CONCRETE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

HILL TRUSTEE OF THE TERRY N. HILL AND MARTHA E. HILL TRUST OF 2007 TERRY N.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KUHN BRADFORD B.

KUHN BRADFORD BEAU

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/29/2021: Request for Dismissal

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/16/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • Hearing09/08/2021 at 08:31 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion - Other Motion for Order for Prejudgment Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by METRO GOLD LINE FOOTHILL EXTENSION CONSTRUCTION AUTHORITY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by METRO GOLD LINE FOOTHILL EXTENSION CONSTRUCTION AUTHORITY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by METRO GOLD LINE FOOTHILL EXTENSION CONSTRUCTION AUTHORITY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by METRO GOLD LINE FOOTHILL EXTENSION CONSTRUCTION AUTHORITY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hill is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KUHN BRADFORD B.