This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/26/2021 at 16:44:27 (UTC).

METRO GOLD LINE FOOTHILL EXTENSION CONSTRUCTION AUTHORITY VS SAN DIMAS GROVE STATION ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/20/2021 METRO GOLD LINE FOOTHILL EXTENSION CONSTRUCTION AUTHORITY filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against SAN DIMAS GROVE STATION ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9085

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

METRO GOLD LINE FOOTHILL EXTENSION CONSTRUCTION AUTHORITY

Defendants

SAN DIMAS GROVE STATION ASSOCIATION A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION

GROVE STATION LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

YOUNG MUNGO

SAN JOSE RANCH COMPANY A CORPORATION

SAN DIMAS IRRIGATION COMPANY A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KUHN BRADFORD B.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/15/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/15/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

6/17/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

6/17/2021: Request for Dismissal

Disclaimer - DISCLAIMER DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST OF DEFENDANT GROVE STATION, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

6/21/2021: Disclaimer - DISCLAIMER DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST OF DEFENDANT GROVE STATION, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/21/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/28/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER BURNER

5/21/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER BURNER

Notice - NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF PROBABLE COMPENSATION

5/21/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF PROBABLE COMPENSATION

Notice - NOTICE SUMMARY OF THE BASIS FOR APPRAISAL OPINION IN SUPPORT OF DEPOSIT (CCP 1255.020(B))

5/21/2021: Notice - NOTICE SUMMARY OF THE BASIS FOR APPRAISAL OPINION IN SUPPORT OF DEPOSIT (CCP 1255.020(B))

Notice - NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION [LIS PENDENS]

5/21/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION [LIS PENDENS]

Motion re: - MOTION RE: FOR ORDER FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION

5/21/2021: Motion re: - MOTION RE: FOR ORDER FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/20/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/20/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/20/2021: Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • Hearing09/27/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion - Other Motion for Order for Prejudgment Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by METRO GOLD LINE FOOTHILL EXTENSION CONSTRUCTION AUTHORITY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Case Management Conference); Filed by METRO GOLD LINE FOOTHILL EXTENSION CONSTRUCTION AUTHORITY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketDisclaimer (DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST OF DEFENDANT GROVE STATION, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY); Filed by METRO GOLD LINE FOOTHILL EXTENSION CONSTRUCTION AUTHORITY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by METRO GOLD LINE FOOTHILL EXTENSION CONSTRUCTION AUTHORITY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by METRO GOLD LINE FOOTHILL EXTENSION CONSTRUCTION AUTHORITY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by METRO GOLD LINE FOOTHILL EXTENSION CONSTRUCTION AUTHORITY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by METRO GOLD LINE FOOTHILL EXTENSION CONSTRUCTION AUTHORITY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Christopher Burner); Filed by METRO GOLD LINE FOOTHILL EXTENSION CONSTRUCTION AUTHORITY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketNotice (Summary of the Basis for Appraisal Opinion in Support of Deposit (CCP 1255.020(B))); Filed by METRO GOLD LINE FOOTHILL EXTENSION CONSTRUCTION AUTHORITY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Deposit of Probable Compensation); Filed by METRO GOLD LINE FOOTHILL EXTENSION CONSTRUCTION AUTHORITY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketMotion re: (for Order for Prejudgment Possession); Filed by METRO GOLD LINE FOOTHILL EXTENSION CONSTRUCTION AUTHORITY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Pendency of Action [Lis Pendens]); Filed by METRO GOLD LINE FOOTHILL EXTENSION CONSTRUCTION AUTHORITY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by METRO GOLD LINE FOOTHILL EXTENSION CONSTRUCTION AUTHORITY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by METRO GOLD LINE FOOTHILL EXTENSION CONSTRUCTION AUTHORITY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by METRO GOLD LINE FOOTHILL EXTENSION CONSTRUCTION AUTHORITY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KUHN BRADFORD B.