This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2019 at 00:45:52 (UTC).

METRO EIGHTEEN, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS HELTZER DEVELOPMENT GROUP, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/26/2019 METRO EIGHTEEN, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HELTZER DEVELOPMENT GROUP, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1321

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

METRO EIGHTEEN INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

ROCKINGHAM DEVELOPMENT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

GENESIS CAPITAL AN ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

HELTZER DEVELOPMENT GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WENZEL TODD

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/26/2019: Complaint

Summons

7/26/2019: Summons

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/26/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/26/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/26/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Dismissal

8/26/2019: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Metro Eighteen, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Metro Eighteen, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Metro Eighteen, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Metro Eighteen, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Todd Joseph Wenzel