This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/15/2019 at 13:03:10 (UTC).

METAL COHEN ET AL VS BARBARA JOYCE GRANT

Case Summary

On 09/13/2017 METAL COHEN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BARBARA JOYCE GRANT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5590

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Guardian Ad Litem

COHEN METAL

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 25

GRANT BARBARA JOYCE

Minor

JEDDAH MEIDAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Minor Attorney

ALDER C. MICHAEL ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

THOMPSON COE & O'MEARA LLP

MANDELL BARBARA J.

Other Attorneys

OSTERTAG JENNIFER MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/25/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Unknown

7/2/2018: Unknown

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT BARBARA JOYCE GRANT

7/2/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT BARBARA JOYCE GRANT

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

7/2/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

DEMAND FOR JURY

7/2/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

12/27/2018: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

Notice

4/26/2019: Notice

Notice of Settlement

5/2/2019: Notice of Settlement

Unknown

5/2/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

5/2/2019: Minute Order

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

11/17/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

9/13/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2019
  • at 2:07 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement) of 05/02/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by COHEN, METAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Notice (Notice of Association of Counsel); Filed by BARBARA JOYCE GRANT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by BARBARA JOYCE GRANT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by COHEN, METAL (Plaintiff); MEIDAN JEDDAH (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by COHEN, METAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC675590    Hearing Date: March 02, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

METAL COHEN, ET AL.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

BARBARA JOYCE GRANT, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC675590

[TENTATIVE] ORDER CONDITIONALLY GRANTING PETITIONER’S PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF MINOR

Dept. 31

1:30 p.m.

March 2, 2020

Plaintiffs, Metal Cohen and Meidan Jeddah, a minor by and through his GAL, Metal Cohen, filed this action against Defendant, Barbara Joyce Grant for damages arising out of an automobile accident. Plaintiff suffered a traumatic brain injury as a result of the accident, and has ongoing complaints of neurological issues as a result of the accident.

Plaintiff, by and through his GAL and attorney, has agreed to settle this action with Defendant for the total amount of $100,000. If approved, $33,333.33 will be used for attorneys’ fees, $7529.70 for medical expenses, and $14,868.07 for costs of suit. Petitioner proposes to use the balance of $44,268.90 to fund a special needs trust.

The Court has reviewed the settlement and finds it is fair and reasonable. The Court also finds the attorneys’ fees fair and reasonable, in that they amount to 33% of the total settlement, and Counsel’s declaration establishes unusual efforts were made in connection with the case.

The Court has notes from the probate attorney concerning the proposed special needs trust. The Court will discuss the notes with Petitioner and Counsel at the time of the hearing.

Per CRC 7.952, Petitioner and Plaintiff must appear at the hearing unless the Court finds good cause to excuse their appearance. Plaintiff is four years old, and the Court therefore finds good cause to excuse him from appearance and testimony. If the Court is satisfied with Petitioner’s testimony at the hearing, and if all concerns regarding the special needs trust are resolved, the petition will be granted.

Petitioner is ordered to give notice.

Dated this 2nd day of March, 2020

Hon. Jon Takasugi

Judge of the Superior Court

Case Number: BC675590    Hearing Date: February 28, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

METAL COHEN, ET AL.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

BARBARA JOYCE GRANT, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC675590

[TENTATIVE] ORDER CONDITIONALLY GRANTING PETITIONER’S PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF MINOR

Dept. 31

1:30 p.m.

March 2, 2020

Plaintiffs, Metal Cohen and Meidan Jeddah, a minor by and through his GAL, Metal Cohen, filed this action against Defendant, Barbara Joyce Grant for damages arising out of an automobile accident.  Plaintiff suffered a traumatic brain injury as a result of the accident, and has ongoing complaints of neurological issues as a result of the accident. 

Plaintiff, by and through his GAL and attorney, has agreed to settle this action with Defendant for the total amount of $100,000.  If approved, $33,333.33 will be used for attorneys’ fees, $7529.70 for medical expenses, and $14,868.07 for costs of suit.  Petitioner proposes to use the balance of $44,268.90 to fund a special needs trust.

The Court has reviewed the settlement and finds it is fair and reasonable.  The Court also finds the attorneys’ fees fair and reasonable, in that they amount to 33% of the total settlement, and Counsel’s declaration establishes unusual efforts were made in connection with the case.

The Court has notes from the probate attorney concerning the proposed special needs trust.  The Court will discuss the notes with Petitioner and Counsel at the time of the hearing. 

Per CRC 7.952, Petitioner and Plaintiff must appear at the hearing unless the Court finds good cause to excuse their appearance.  Plaintiff is four years old, and the Court therefore finds good cause to excuse him from appearance and testimony.  If the Court is satisfied with Petitioner’s testimony at the hearing, and if all concerns regarding the special needs trust are resolved, the petition will be granted.

Petitioner is ordered to give notice.

Dated this 2nd day of March, 2020

Hon. Jon Takasugi

Judge of the Superior Court