This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/09/2021 at 14:09:38 (UTC).

MESA GLEN HOLDINGS, LLC VS CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 MESA GLEN HOLDINGS, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KEVIN C. BRAZILE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5794

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KEVIN C. BRAZILE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MESA GLEN HOLDINGS LLC DBA MESA GLEN CARE CENTER

Defendant

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALKER KATHLEEN M

Defendant Attorney

BYERTS MICHAEL EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/27/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/5/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/5/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/7/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

6/14/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

General Denial

6/11/2021: General Denial

Case Management Statement

9/14/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/26/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/22/2021: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

9/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2023
  • Hearing08/14/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 20 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • Hearing08/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 20 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • Hearing09/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 20 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (RE: Case Management Conference); Filed by MESA GLEN HOLDINGS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 20, Kevin C. Brazile, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 20, Kevin C. Brazile, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by MESA GLEN HOLDINGS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING); Filed by MESA GLEN HOLDINGS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MESA GLEN HOLDINGS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MESA GLEN HOLDINGS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MESA GLEN HOLDINGS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MESA GLEN HOLDINGS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MESA GLEN HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BYERTS MICHAEL EDWARD