This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/12/2022 at 02:36:01 (UTC).

MERZIER MCGINNIS VS NORRED & ASSOCIATES, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/14/2020 MERZIER MCGINNIS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against NORRED ASSOCIATES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8453

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCGINNIS MERZIER

Defendant

NORRED & ASSOCIATES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEBSTER JOSHUA

Defendant Attorney

BROMLEY RICHARD E

 

Court Documents

Response - RESPONSE JOINT RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

8/27/2021: Response - RESPONSE JOINT RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF ADVANCING AND CONTINUING HEARING DATE)

8/31/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF ADVANCING AND CONTINUING HEARING DATE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF ADVANCING AND CONTINUING HEARING DATE) OF 08/31/2021

8/31/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF ADVANCING AND CONTINUING HEARING DATE) OF 08/31/2021

Request for Dismissal

10/14/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

10/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

7/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

2/4/2021: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

3/26/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

5/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 11/06/2020

11/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 11/06/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/06/2020

11/6/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/06/2020

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE OCTOBER 30, 2020 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/30/2020: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE OCTOBER 30, 2020 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

9/14/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

8/27/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/28/2020: Case Management Statement

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Merzier McGinnis (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • Docketat 4:43 PM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order Re: Notice of Advancing and Continuing Hearing Date)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Advancing and Continuing Hearing Date) of 08/31/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketResponse (JOINT RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL); Filed by Merzier McGinnis (Plaintiff); NORRED & ASSOCIATES, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by NORRED & ASSOCIATES, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by NORRED & ASSOCIATES, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by NORRED & ASSOCIATES, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by NORRED & ASSOCIATES, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Merzier McGinnis (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Merzier McGinnis (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Merzier McGinnis (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Merzier McGinnis (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less